EP3381911 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING -VALEROLACTONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UBE Industries, Ltd. 1978-96 Oazakogushi Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA Atsushi c/o UBE INDUSTRIES LTD. 1978-96 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO Yasushi c/o UBE INDUSTRIES LTD. 1978-96 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2018/40] | Application number, filing date | 16865989.4 | 06.09.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016JP76137 | Priority number, date | JP20150224093 | 16.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015224093 | [2018/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017085986 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3381911 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/33, B01J23/46, C07B61/00 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
C07D307/33 (EP,US);
B01J23/462 (US);
B01J23/464 (US);
B01J23/468 (US);
B01J23/46 (EP,US);
C07B61/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VALEROLACTON | [2018/40] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING -VALEROLACTONE | [2018/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE -VALÉROLACTONE | [2018/40] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2018 | Translation filed | 08.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 08.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/50] | 29.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO02074760 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document * [I] 3 | International search | [X]WO2015026234 (UNIV UTRECHT HOLDING BV [NL]) [X] 1-5 * , claims; examples 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [X]CN102658131 (UNIV DALIAN TECH) [X] 1-5 * , claims; examples 12 to 13 (Family: none) *; | [X]US2011046399 (HAAN RENE JOHAN [NL], et al) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0056] to [0058]; example 1; table 2 & WO 2011/015645 A2 & EP 2462100 A2 & CA 2769426 A1 *; | [X]JP2008525372 (Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.) [X] 1, 3-5 * , paragraphs [0029] to [0032]; table 1 & US 2006/0162239 A1 paragraphs [0039] to [0043]; table 1 & WO 2006/067171 A1 & EP 1828095 A1 & CA 2591796 A1 & CN 101087749 A *; | [X]JP2015074619 (UBE INDUSTRIES) [X] 1, 3-5 * , examples 1, 1C (Family: none) *; | [X]US5883266 (ELLIOTT DOUGLAS C [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 5 * , claims; example 2; table 2a (Family: none) *; | [X] - LUO, WENHAO et al., "High performing and stable supported nano-alloys for the catalytic hydrogenation of levulinic acid to y-valerolactone", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20150317), vol. 6, no. 6540, ISSN 2041-1723, pages 1 - 10, XP055383971 [X] 1-2, 4-5 * , particularly, p. 3, Figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms7540 | [X] - LI, WENJING et al., "FeSBA-15-supported ruthenium catalyst for the selective hydrogenolysis of carboxylic acids to alcoholic chemicals", Catalysis Today, (20150801), vol. 251, ISSN 0920-5861, pages 53 - 59, XP029228611 [X] 1, 3-5 * , particularly, p.57-58, Table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cattod.2014.10.044 | [X] - YANG, YING et al., "Facile Fabrication of Composition-Tuned Ru-Ni Bimetallics in Ordered Mesoporous Carbon for Levulinic Acid Hydrogenation", ACS Catal, (20140000), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 2155-5435, pages 1419 - 1425, XP055383973 [X] 1, 4-5 * , particularly, p.1421, Figure 5, Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cs401030u | [XP] - AL-NAJI, MAJD et al., "Insights into the selective hydrogenation of levulinic acid to y-valerolactone using supported mono- and bimetallic catalysts", Journal of Molecular Catalysis A: Chemical, (20160305), vol. 417, ISSN 1381-1169, pages 145 - 152, XP029495164 [XP] 1, 3-5 * , particularly, pp.149-151, Figure 6, Table3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcata.2016.03.015 |