EP3379682 - CHARGE/DISCHARGE CONTROL DEVICE, CHARGE/DISCHARGE CONTROL SYSTEM, AND CHARGE/DISCHARGE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKATSUKA, Hiromasa c/o OMRON CORPORATION 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
WADA, Junichi c/o OMRON CORPORATION 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
KASAI, Kazuki c/o OMRON CORPORATION 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstraße 29a 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/39] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16866167.6 | 02.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016JP82597 | Priority number, date | JP20150224440 | 17.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015224440 | [2018/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017086165 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3379682 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3379682 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/80, H02J7/00, B60L50/50, B60L58/22, B60L58/14, B60L58/12, B60L50/60 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
B60L50/60 (EP,US);
B60L53/80 (EP,US);
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
B60L58/14 (EP,US);
B60L58/22 (EP,US);
B62M6/90 (US);
H02J7/00 (EP,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
B60L2260/54 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | H02J7/00, B60L53/80, B60L58/12, B60L58/14, B60L58/22, B60L50/50 | ||
Former IPC [2018/39] | H02J7/00, B60L11/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR LADUNGS-/ENTLADUNGSSTEUERUNG, SYSTEM ZUR LADUNGS-/ENTLADUNGSSTEUERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR LADUNGS-/ENTLADUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2018/39] | English: | CHARGE/DISCHARGE CONTROL DEVICE, CHARGE/DISCHARGE CONTROL SYSTEM, AND CHARGE/DISCHARGE CONTROL METHOD | [2018/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE/DÉCHARGE, SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE/DÉCHARGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE/DÉCHARGE | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2018 | Translation filed | 08.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 08.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2016 | AL | 28.09.2022 | AT | 28.09.2022 | BG | 28.09.2022 | CY | 28.09.2022 | CZ | 28.09.2022 | DK | 28.09.2022 | EE | 28.09.2022 | ES | 28.09.2022 | FI | 28.09.2022 | HR | 28.09.2022 | IT | 28.09.2022 | LT | 28.09.2022 | LV | 28.09.2022 | MC | 28.09.2022 | MK | 28.09.2022 | MT | 28.09.2022 | NL | 28.09.2022 | PL | 28.09.2022 | RO | 28.09.2022 | RS | 28.09.2022 | SE | 28.09.2022 | SI | 28.09.2022 | SK | 28.09.2022 | SM | 28.09.2022 | IE | 02.11.2022 | LU | 02.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | NO | 28.12.2022 | GR | 29.12.2022 | IS | 28.01.2023 | PT | 30.01.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 02.11.2016 | |
AL | 28.09.2022 | ||
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
BG | 28.09.2022 | ||
CY | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
IT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
MK | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 02.11.2016 | |
AL | 28.09.2022 | ||
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CY | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
IT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
MK | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 02.11.2016 | |
AL | 28.09.2022 | ||
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CY | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
IT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 02.11.2016 | |
AL | 28.09.2022 | ||
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CY | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.11.2016 | |
AL | 28.09.2022 | ||
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2738908 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0104] * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2014115015 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0038] *; | [Y]US2015002102 (OHASHI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0103] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2015123611 (HUANG SHIH-CHENG [TW]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] * | International search | [A]JP2002305843 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1-15* , entire text; all drawings & US 2002/0140397 A1 entire text; all drawings *; | [YA]WO2013014930 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7, 11-15 * , paragraphs [0034] to [0043], [0053], [0064], [0072], [0104] to [0114]; fig. 1, 10 & US 2014/0167657 A1 paragraphs [0044] to [0053], [0062], [0071], [0077], [0109] to [0119]; fig. 1, 10 & EP 2738908 A1 * [A] 8-10; | [YA]JP2013192327 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 1-7, 11-15 * , paragraphs [0006] to [0008], [0027] to [0032], [0040], [0089] to [0098]; fig. 1 to 3, 7 & US 2015/0002102 A1 paragraphs [0006] to [0008], [0039] to [0044], [0052], [0101] to [0110]; fig. 1 to 3, 7 & WO 2013/136851 A1 * [A] 8-10 |