EP3379466 - BATTERY RESERVATION DEVICE AND BATTERY RESERVATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKATSUKA, Hiromasa c/o OMRON CORPORATION 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
WADA, Junichi c/o OMRON CORPORATION 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
KASAI, Kazuki c/o OMRON CORPORATION 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16866175.9 | 02.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016JP82676 | Priority number, date | JP20150224345 | 17.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015224345 | [2018/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017086173 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3379466 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/02, B60L11/18, G06Q50/06, G06Q50/10, H01M10/42, H02J7/00, H02J13/00 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0645 (EP,US);
B60L50/60 (EP,US);
B60L53/665 (EP,US);
B60L53/80 (EP,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
G06Q50/10 (EP,US);
H01M10/42 (EP);
H02J13/00 (EP);
H02J7/00 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32328 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
Y02T90/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | BATTERIERESERVIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BATTERIERESERVIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/39] | English: | BATTERY RESERVATION DEVICE AND BATTERY RESERVATION METHOD | [2018/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉSERVATION DE BATTERIES ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉSERVATION DE BATTERIES | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2018 | Translation filed | 02.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 02.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/38] | 07.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.05.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2578997 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] ** paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0070] *; | [I]US9177306 (PENILLA ANGEL A [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - column 5, line 33 * * column 12, line 51 - column 14, line 23 * * column 19, line 56 - column 21, line 8 * * column 23, line 51 - line 65 * * column 24, line 60 - column 25, line 5 * * column 31, line 33 - line 46 * * column 32, line 25 - column 34, line 44 * | International search | [A]JP2006331405 (NTT FACILITIES INC) [A] 1-9 * , particularly, paragraphs [0014] to [0157] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010107203 (AISIN AW CO) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2010/0106401 A1 entire text; all drawings & EP 2181884 A1 & CN 101769746 A *; | [A]JP2011197932 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012145499 (JSOL CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014003803 (UNIV KOOKMIN IND ACAD COOP FOUND) [A] 1-9* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |