EP3377480 - 4-((6-(2,4-DIFLUOROPHENYL)-1,1-DIFLUORO-2-HYDROXY-3-(1H-1,2,4-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PROPYL)PYRIDIN-3-YL)OXY)BENZONITRILE AND PROCESSES OF PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAO, Yan 3865 Castle Rock Drive Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | 02 /
YANG, Qiang 11437 Mears Drive Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | 03 /
RYAN, Sarah 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 16867089.1 | 17.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016US62398 | Priority number, date | US201562256548P | 17.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562256548 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017087592 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377480 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D405/06, C07D213/127 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | 4-((6-(2,4-DIFLUROPHENYL)-1,1-DIFLUOR-2-HYDROXY-3-(1H-1,2,4-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PROPYL)PYRIDIN-3-YL)OXY)BENZONITRIL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2018/39] | English: | 4-((6-(2,4-DIFLUOROPHENYL)-1,1-DIFLUORO-2-HYDROXY-3-(1H-1,2,4-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PROPYL)PYRIDIN-3-YL)OXY)BENZONITRILE AND PROCESSES OF PREPARATION | [2018/39] | French: | 4-((6-(2,4-DIFLUOROPHÉNYL)-1,1-DIFLUORO-2-HYDROXY-3-(1H-1,2,4-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PROPYL)PYRIDINE-3-YL)OXY)BENZONITRILE ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 14.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 04.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2016187201 (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [E] 1-8* example 1; claim 2 * | International search | [Y]WO2014193974 (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * ; page43, page60, page62 *; | [A]US2015246898 (GUSTAFSON GARY D [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * ; entire document *; | [A]WO2015143188 (VIAMET PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1-8* ; entire document *; | [Y]WO2015150947 (WOCKHARDT LTD [IN]) [Y] 1-8 * ; page11, page12 *; | [A]US2015291632 (LOSO MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * ; entire document * |