EP3377074 - METHODS OF DIAGNOSING POST TRAUMATIC EPILEPSY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/39] | METHODS OF DIAGNOSING EPILEPSY | ||
[2023/29] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dignity Health 3033 N. Third Avenue Phoenix, Arizona 85013 / US | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREIMAN, David 521 W. Rose Lane Phoenix, Arizona 85013 / US | 02 /
SCHOOLEY, Dustin 6200 North 89th Avenue Glendale, Arizona 85305 / US | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Hutter, Anton Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [2024/01] |
Former [2018/39] | Hutter, Anton Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16867175.8 | 17.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016US62615 | Priority number, date | US201562257068P | 18.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562257068 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017087726 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377074 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3377074 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6883 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/118 (US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/39] | A61K31/7088, A61K31/7105, A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON POSTTRAUMATISCHER EPILEPSIE | [2023/29] | English: | METHODS OF DIAGNOSING POST TRAUMATIC EPILEPSY | [2023/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DIAGNOSTIC DE L'ÉPILEPSIE POST-TRAUMATIQUE | [2023/29] |
Former [2018/39] | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON EPILEPSIE | ||
Former [2018/39] | METHODS OF DIAGNOSING EPILEPSY | ||
Former [2018/39] | PROCÉDÉS DE DIAGNOSTIC DE L'ÉPILEPSIE | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 14.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23207780.0 / EP4328324 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 20.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2014096418 (UCB PHARMA GBMH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-8,12,15 * abstract * [A] 9 [I] 3,5,10,11,13,14; | [XAI] - ANNA MARIA BOT ET AL, "Alterations in miRNA Levels in the Dentate Gyrus in Epileptic Rats", PLOS ONE, (20131011), vol. 8, no. 10, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0076051, page e76051, XP055172903 [X] 1-3,6-8,12,15 * the whole document * [A] 9 [I] 5,10,11,13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0076051 | [A] - RONCON PAOLO ET AL, "MicroRNA profiles in hippocampal granule cells and plasma of rats with pilocarpine-induced epilepsy - comparison with human epileptic samples", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20150918), vol. 5, XP002789428 [A] 1-3,5-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep14143 | [A] - WALID ALSHARAFI ET AL, "Dynamic Expression of MicroRNAs (183, 135a, 125b, 128, 30c and 27a) in the Rat Pilocarpine Model and Temporal Lobe Epilepsy Patients", CNS & NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS -DRUG TARGETS, (20150101), vol. 14, pages 1096 - 1102, XP055469347 [A] 1-3,5-11 * abstract * | [A] - RISBUD RASHMI M ET AL, "Changes in MicroRNA Expression in the Whole Hippocampus and Hippocampal Synaptoneurosome Fraction following Pilocarpine Induced Status Epilepticus", PLOS ONE, (201301), vol. 8, no. 1, XP002789421 [A] 1-3,5-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0053464 | [A] - ASHHAB MUHAMMAD USMAN ET AL, "microRNA s (9, 138, 181A, 221, and 222) and mesial temporal lobe epilepsy in developing brains", TRANSLATIONAL NEUROSCIENCE, (201309), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 357 - 362, XP002789422 [A] 1-3,5-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2478/s13380-013-0128-z | [A] - YI-JUN SONG ET AL, "Temporal lobe epilepsy induces differential expression of hippocampal miRNAs including let-7e and miR-23a/b", BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 1387, doi:10.1016/J.BRAINRES.2011.02.073, ISSN 0006-8993, (20110222), pages 134 - 140, (20110302), XP028189695 [A] 1-3,5-11 * figure 2a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2011.02.073 | [A] - LI MENG-MENG ET AL, "MicroRNAs dysregulation in epilepsy", BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20131003), vol. 1584, doi:10.1016/J.BRAINRES.2013.09.049, ISSN 0006-8993, pages 94 - 104, XP029064516 [A] 1-3,5-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2013.09.049 | [A] - HU K ET AL, "Expression profile of microRNAs in rat hippocampus following lithium-pilocarpine-induced status epilepticus", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 488, no. 3, ISSN 0304-3940, (20110125), pages 252 - 257, (20110105), XP027586171 [A] 1-3,5-11 * the whole document * | [A] - EL-NAGGAR H ET AL, "PLASMA MICRORNA PROFILING IDENTIFIES POTENTIAL BIOMARKERS OF HUMAN TEMPORAL LOBE EPILEPSY", EPILEPSIA, & 31ST INTERNATIONAL EPILEPSY CONGRESS; ISTANBUL, TURKEY; SEPTEMBER 05 -09, 2015, (201502), vol. 56, no. Suppl. 1, Sp. Iss. SI, page 116, XP002789423 [A] 1-3,5-11 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2013143314 (SHIELS PAUL [GB], et al) [Y] 9-12, 22, 23* entire document *; | [Y]US2013287772 (HALBERT DAVID D [US], et al) [Y] 4, 28 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014163089 (CHEN ALON [IL], et al) [Y] 5, 29 * entire document *; | [XY]WO2014096418 (UCB PHARMA GBMH [DE]) [X] 1-3, 6, 13-15, 17, 20, 21, 24-27, 30 * entire document * [Y] 4, 5, 7-12, 16, 22, 23, 28, 29; | [Y]US2014370531 (BLYTH BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 7, 8, 16 * entire document * | by applicant | - TREIMAN et al., Epilepsy Res, (19900000), vol. 5, pages 49 - 60 |