EP3377225 - CARTRIDGE-BASED SYSTEM FOR LONG TERM CULTURE OF CELL CLUSTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANNON, Alanna, R. 12 Stevens Street Medford, MA 02155 / US | 02 /
GLIEBERMAN, Aaron, L. 60 Oxford Street Rm 331 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 03 /
PARKER, Kevin, Kit 29 Oxford Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 04 /
POPE, Benjamin, D. 120 Summer Street 2 Medford, MA 02155 / US | 05 /
SHORES, Kevin, L. 4505 Main Street Apt.323 virginia beach, VA 23462 / US | 06 /
SINATRA, Nina, R. 58 Oxford Street Rm 406 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16867196.4 | 18.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016US62693 | Priority number, date | US201562256939P | 18.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562256939 P | US201562262687P | 03.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562262687 P | US201662332092P | 05.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662332092 P | US201662395512P | 16.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662395512 P | US201662411124P | 21.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662411124 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017087759 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377225 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01L9/00, B01L99/00, C12Q1/00, C40B40/10, G01N27/02, G01N27/30, G01N33/543 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
G01N33/5082 (EP,US);
C12M23/42 (US);
C12M21/08 (US);
C12M23/12 (US);
C12M23/16 (US);
C12M25/14 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | KASSETTENBASIERTES SYSTEM ZUR LANGZEITZÜCHTUNG VON ZELLCLUSTERN | [2018/39] | English: | CARTRIDGE-BASED SYSTEM FOR LONG TERM CULTURE OF CELL CLUSTERS | [2018/39] | French: | SYSTÈMES À BASE DE CARTOUCHE POUR LA CULTURE À LONG TERME D'AGRÉGATS CELLULAIRES | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 14.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2013086502 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [Y] 7,8,15-17 * par 00189-00190; cl 1-5. *; | [A]US2015060303 (BLOHM LARS [DE], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2015061907 (MIKLAS JASON [CA], et al) [Y] 7,8,15-17 * par 0011, 0015, 0018-0019, 00506, 00513-00514. * | International search | [Y]US2002137715 (MAUVIEL ALAIN [FR]) [Y] 50, 127 * paragraph [0036] *; | [Y]US2005287557 (EFENDIC SUAD [SE]) [Y] 150/108,151/150/108. 152/151/150/108, 153/151/150/108. 154/153/151/150/108. 155/108,156/155/108, 157/156/155/108, 158/156/155/108, 159/158/156/155/108, * ; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2009061031 (LEE-HUANG SYLVIA [US], et al) [Y] 160/108, 161/160/108 162/161/160/108, 163/161/160/108, 164/163/161/160/108, 165/108, 166/165/108,167/166/165/108,168/166/165/108, 169/168/166/165/108 * paragraphs [0063]-[0069] *; | [Y]US2009098628 (RAMASUBRAMANIAN M K [US]) [Y] 151/150/108, 152/151/150/108, 153/151/150/108, 154/153/151/150/108, 156/155/108, 157/156/155/108, 158/156/155/108, 159/158/156/155/108 * ; paragraphs [0017], [0020], [0050] *; | [A]US2013234013 (PATTERSON MICHAEL EDGAR [US], et al) [A] 11-22, 27-29, 32-41, 55-58, 87/85/84/1, 87/85/84/3, 87/85/84/9, 87/85/84/23-25, 87/85/84/30, 87/85/84/59, 87/85/84/61, 88/87/85/84/1, 88/87/85/84/3, 88/87/85/84/9, 88/87/85/84/23-25, 88/87/85/84/30, 8* ; paragraphs [0035], [0049] *; | [XY]US2014151224 (GLEZER ELI N [US], et al) [X] 0 * ; figures 1, 13B, 14A; 14B; paragraphs [0013], [0048], [0101], [0104], [0126], [0209], [0210], [0214], [0216], [0218], [0230], [0231], [0235], [0291] * [Y] 0; | [Y]US2014370111 (BOYAN BARBARA DALE [US], et al) [Y] 161/160/108, 162/161/160/108, 163/161/160/108, 164/163/161/160/108, 166/165/108, 164 167/166/165/108, 168/166/165/108, 169/168/167/166/165/108 * ; paragraphs [0040], [0068], [00639] *; | [Y]US2015004077 (WIKSWO JOHN P [US], et al) [Y] 44, 51, 84/1, 84/3, 84/9, 84/23-25, 84/30, 84/59, 84/61, 85/84/1, 85/84/3, 85/84/9, 85/84/23-25, 85/84/30, 85/84/59, 85/84/61, 86/85/84/61, 86/85/84/3, 86/85/84/3, 86/85/84/23-25, 86/85/84/30, 86/85/8 * figure 23; paragraphs [0006], [0127], [0403] *; | [Y]US2015253307 (PARKER KEVIN KIT [US], et al) [Y] 42, 44-51, 119, 121-128 * paragraph [0047]; claim 41 * |