EP3377116 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CORRECTION OF HERITABLE OCULAR DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street, Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | For all designated states Mitchell, Lloyd G. 4519 Gretna Street Bethesda MD 20814 / US | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITCHELL, Lloyd, G. 4519 Gretna Street Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 02 /
BENNETT, Jean 182 Fishers Road Bryn Mawr, PA 19010 / US | 03 /
BENNICELLI, Jeannette 4602 Springfield Avenue Philadelphia, PA 19143 / US | 04 /
DOOLEY, Scott, J. 4514 Pine Street Apt. 104 Philadelphia, PA 19143 / US | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 16867296.2 | 18.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016US62941 | Priority number, date | US201562257500P | 19.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562257500 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017087900 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377116 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C07H21/02, C07H21/04 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
A61K48/005 (EP,US);
A61K48/0075 (US);
C12N15/00 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N2740/10043 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR KORREKTUR VON ERBLICHER AUGENERKRANKUNG | [2018/39] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CORRECTION OF HERITABLE OCULAR DISEASE | [2018/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE CORRECTION DE MALADIE OCULAIRE HÉRÉDITAIRE | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 16.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - GERARD XAVIER ET AL, "Intravitreal Injection of Splice-switching Oligonucleotides to Manipulate Splicing in Retinal Cells", MOLECULAR THERAPY-NUCLEIC ACIDS, (201509), vol. 4, XP002788928 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - COLLIN ROB W J ET AL, "Antisense Oligonucleotide (AON)-based Therapy for Leber Congenital Amaurosis Caused by a Frequent Mutation in CEP290", MOLECULAR THERAPY-NUCLEIC ACIDS, (201203), vol. 1, XP002788929 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mtna.2012.3 | [Y] - GARANTO ALEJANDRO ET AL, "Species-dependent splice recognition of a cryptic exon resulting from a recurrent intronic CEP290 mutation that causes congenital blindness.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES 09 MAR 2015, (20150309), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 1422-0067, pages 5285 - 5298, XP002788937 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms16035285 | [Y] - U. KOLLER ET AL, "A novel screening system improves genetic correction by internal exon replacement", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20110901), vol. 39, no. 16, doi:10.1093/nar/gkr465, ISSN 0305-1048, pages e108 - e108, XP055087654 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr465 | [XP] - GARANTO ALEJANDRO ET AL, "In vitro and in vivo rescue of aberrant splicing in CEP290-associated LCA by antisense oligonucleotide delivery", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (20160615), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 2552 - 2563, XP002788931 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [XP] - ALEJANDRO GARANTO ET AL, "Species-Dependent Splice Recognition of a Cryptic Exon Resulting from a Recurrent Intronic CEP290 Mutation that Causes Congenital Blindness", INT. J. MOL. SCI., (20151209), vol. 16, no. 12, doi:10.3390/ijms16035285, ISSN 1661-6596, pages 5285 - 5298, XP055557072 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms16035285 | International search | [Y]US2013059901 (BAUER JOHANN [AT], et al) [Y] 16 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014087444 (BENNETT JEAN [US], et al) [Y] 12 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014243388 (HASTINGS MICHELLE L [US]) [Y] 19* entire document *; | [XY]US2015252358 (MAEDER MORGAN L [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 5, 8, 10, 11, 13-15, 17, 21 * entire document * [Y] 3, 4, 6, 7, 9, 12, 16, 18-20; | [Y] - ZHANG et al., "Protein misfolding and the pathogenesis of ABCA4-associated retinal degenerations", Human Molecular Genetics, (20150224), vol. 24, no. 11, pages 3220 - 3237, XP055382585 [Y] 3, 6, 7, 18, 20 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/ddv073 | [Y] - MAIA-LOPES et al., "ABCA4 mutations in Portuguese Stargardt patients: identification of new mutations and their phenotypic analysis", Molecular Vision, (20090325), vol. 15, pages 584 - 591, XP055382588 [Y] 4, 9 * . entire document * |