EP3377058 - FORMULATIONS FOR 2-HETEROARYL SUBSTITUTED BENZOFURANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. 4995 Bradenton Avenue Suite 240 Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CESATI, Richard R., III 63 Nashua Road Pepperell, Massachusetts 01463 / US | 02 /
CASEBIER, David S. 161 Ember Lane Carlisle, Massachusetts 01741-1342 / US | 03 /
MORETON, Richard Christian 29 Shawmut Road Waltham, Massachusetts 02452 / US | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16867343.2 | 21.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016US63154 | Priority number, date | US201562258309P | 20.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562258309 P | US201562258326P | 20.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562258326 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017087965 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377058 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/04, A61K51/12, A61K31/343, A61K47/10, A61P25/28, C07D307/83 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
A61K51/0455 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/02 (KR);
A61K47/10 (KR);
A61K47/22 (KR);
A61K51/121 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61K2123/00 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/39] | A61K31/343, A61K47/10, A61K51/00, A61P25/28, C07D307/83 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN FÜR 2-HETEROARYL-SUBSTITUIERTE BENZOFURANE | [2018/39] | English: | FORMULATIONS FOR 2-HETEROARYL SUBSTITUTED BENZOFURANS | [2018/39] | French: | FORMULATIONS POUR BENZOFURANES À SUBSTITUTION 2-HÉTÉROARYLE | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 19.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 24.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - BRITT-MARIE SWAHN ET AL, "Synthesis and evaluation of pyridylbenzofuran, pyridylbenzothiazole and pyridylbenzoxazole derivatives as 18F-PET imaging agents for [beta]-amyloid plaques", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20120101), vol. 22, no. 13, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2012.05.011, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 4332 - 4337, XP055548765 [Y] 1-14 * whole document and in particular Scheme 6; page 4336, right-hand column, 2nd full paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2012.05.011 | [Y] - M. PATT ET AL, "Influence of additives to the formulation of n.c.a. [11C]PiB on sterile filter performance", APPLIED RADIATION AND ISOTOPES., GB, (20130919), vol. 82, doi:10.1016/j.apradiso.2013.09.004, ISSN 0969-8043, pages 289 - 292, XP055601595 [Y] 1-14 * whole document and in particular page 289, "Highlights"; page 289, "Abstract"; page 289, "1. Introduction"; page 290, "3. Methods"; Tables 1 and 2; pages 290-292, "4. Results" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apradiso.2013.09.004 | International search | [XY]WO2014007982 (JANSSEN ALZHEIMER IMMUNOTHERAP [IE], et al) [X] 1, 5, 8, 12, 13, 17, 20, 24, 26, 30, 35, 40 * entire document * [Y] 59, 60; | [A]US2012264943 (BJOERK SETH [SE], et al) [A] 1-38, 40-48, 51-61 * entire document *; | [A]WO2015027276 (CRC FOR MENTAL HEALTH LTD [AU]) [A] 1-38, 40-48, 51-61 * entire document * | [Y] - ROWE et al., "Head-to-Head Comparison of 11C-PiB and 18F-AZD4694 (NAV4694) for B-Amyloid Imaging in Aging and Dementia.", The Journal of Nuclear Medicine;, vol. 54, no. 6;, (20130410), pages 880 - 886;, URL: http:lljnm.snmjournals.orglcontenU54l6l880.long, XP055382487 [Y] 59, 60 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.112.114785 |