EP3389568 - PRE-OPERATIVE DETERMINATION OF IMPLANT CONFIGURATION FOR SOFT-TISSUE BALANCING IN ORTHOPEDIC SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Materialise NV Technologielaan 15 3001 Leuven / BE | [2021/41] |
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states Materialise N.V. Technologielaan 15 3001 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANHEULE, Valentine Technologielaan 15 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
WIRIX-SPEETJENS, Roel Technologielaan 15 3001 Leuven / BE | 03 /
DELPORT, Hendrik Technologielaan 15 3001 Leuven / BE | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Luten, Martin Haaije, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16867400.0 | 14.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016US66581 | Priority number, date | US201562268872P | 17.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562268872 P | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017106294 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3389568 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/10, // A61F2/38, A61B17/17, A61F2/46 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
A61B17/56 (US);
A61B17/17 (EP,US);
A61B2017/568 (EP,US);
A61B2034/102 (EP,US);
A61B2034/104 (EP,US);
A61B2034/107 (EP,US);
A61B2034/108 (EP,US);
A61F2/38 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4633 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | A61F2/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | PRÄOPERATIVE BESTIMMUNG DER IMPLANTATKONFIGURATION FÜR WEICHGEWEBEAUSGLEICH IN DER ORTHOPÄDISCHEN CHIRURGIE | [2018/43] | English: | PRE-OPERATIVE DETERMINATION OF IMPLANT CONFIGURATION FOR SOFT-TISSUE BALANCING IN ORTHOPEDIC SURGERY | [2018/43] | French: | DÉTERMINATION PRÉOPÉRATOIRE DE LA CONFIGURATION D'UN IMPLANT POUR L'ÉQUILIBRAGE DES TISSUS MOUS EN CHIRURGIE ORTHOPÉDIQUE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 12.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005119661 (HODGSON ANTONY J [GB], et al) [Y] 24 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0090] ** paragraph [0108] *; | [IAY]US2010076563 (OTTO JASON KARL [US], et al) [I] 1,3-7,11-15,17-22,31-38 * figures 1,15a-15f * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0109] * [A] 23,25-27 [Y] 24; | [XI]US2012041446 (WONG TERRANCE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,35,39 * paragraph [0182] - paragraph [0183] * * paragraph [0298] * * paragraph [0660] * [I] 3,38; | [IA]US2014244220 (MCKINNON BRIAN W [US], et al) [I] 1,3-7,11-15,17-22,31-38 * figures 2,17 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0061] * [A] 23,25-27; | [XI]US2015265363 (WHITE BRUCE F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,17,35,39 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0079] * [I] 38 | by applicant | US5141680 | US5192539 |