EP3379934 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IDENTIFYING SUBJECTS AT RISK FOR CHECKPOINT BLOCKADE THERAPY ASSOCIATED COLITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/40] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IDENTIFYING AND TREATING SUBJECTS AT RISK FOR CHECKPOINT BLOCKADE THERAPY ASSOCIATED COLITIS | ||
[2023/48] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAMER, Eric 24 Fairfield Street Montclair, NJ 07042-4136 / US | 02 /
WOLCHOK, Jedd, D. 333 East 30th Street Apt. 17C New York, NY 10016 / US | 03 /
DUBIN, Krista 1230 York Avenue Box 44 New York, NY 10065 / US | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2018/40] | Application number, filing date | 16869244.0 | 23.11.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016US63530 | Priority number, date | US201562259445P | 24.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562259445 P | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017091694 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3379934 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3379934 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/00, A01N65/00, A61B5/00, A61K9/00, A61K35/66, A61K35/74, A61P1/00, A61K35/742, G01N33/569, A23L5/00, A61K45/06 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
A61K35/742 (EP,US);
A23L5/00 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0031 (US);
A61K9/0043 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/56911 (EP,US);
A61K2035/115 (US);
G01N2800/067 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/40] | A01N63/00, A01N65/00, A61B5/00, A61K9/00, A61K35/66, A61K35/74 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON PATIENTEN MIT RISIKO ZUR COLITIS IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT CHECKPOINT-BLOCKADE-THERAPIE | [2023/48] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IDENTIFYING SUBJECTS AT RISK FOR CHECKPOINT BLOCKADE THERAPY ASSOCIATED COLITIS | [2023/48] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR L'IDENTIFICATION DE SUJETS À RISQUE DE DÉVELOPPER UNE COLITE ASSOCIÉE À UNE THÉRAPIE DE BLOCAGE DE POINTS DE CONTRÔLE | [2023/48] |
Former [2018/40] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON PATIENTEN MIT RISIKO ZUR COLITIS IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT CHECKPOINT-BLOCKADE-THERAPIE | ||
Former [2018/40] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IDENTIFYING AND TREATING SUBJECTS AT RISK FOR CHECKPOINT BLOCKADE THERAPY ASSOCIATED COLITIS | ||
Former [2018/40] | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR L'IDENTIFICATION ET LE TRAITEMENT DE SUJETS À RISQUE DE DÉVELOPPER UNE COLITE ASSOCIÉE À UNE THÉRAPIE DE BLOCAGE DE POINTS DE CONTRÔLE | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 01.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013175038 (CONSEJO SUPERIOR INVESTIGACION [ES]) [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document *; | [X] - PAOLA GAUFFIN CANO ET AL, "Bacteroides uniformis CECT 7771 Ameliorates Metabolic and Immunological Dysfunction in Mice with High-Fat-Diet Induced Obesity", PLOS ONE, (20120726), vol. 7, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0041079, page e41079, XP055233593 [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0041079 | [A] - GUPTA A ET AL, "Systematic review: colitis associated with anti-CTLA-4 therapy.", ALIMENTARY PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS AUG 2015, (201508), vol. 42, no. 4, ISSN 1365-2036, pages 406 - 417, XP002790922 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/apt.13281 | [XP] - KRISTA DUBIN ET AL, "Intestinal microbiome analyses identify melanoma patients at risk for checkpoint-blockade-induced colitis", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20160202), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1038/ncomms10391, pages 1 - 8, XP055563360 [XP] 2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms10391 | [A] - SUGITA H ET AL, "THE VITAMIN B-12-PRODUCING ABILITY OF THE INTESTINAL MICROFLORA OF FRESHWATER FISH", AQUACULTURE, (1991), vol. 92, no. 2-3, ISSN 0044-8486, pages 267 - 276, XP002790923 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0044-8486(91)90028-6 | International search | [Y]WO2014082050 (SERES HEALTH INC [US]) [Y] 21* entire document *; | [XY]US2015238544 (JONES LEE A [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * entire document * [Y] 5-11, 19, 20; | [Y]WO2015166492 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]) [Y] 18-25, 29-35, 40, 43 * entire document *; | [Y] - MAGNUSDOTTIR et al., "Systematic genome assessment uf B-vitamin biosynthesis suggests co-operation among gut microbes", Frontiers in Genetics, (20150420), vol. 6, no. 148, pages 1 - 18, XP055385258 [Y] 5-11, 22-25, 29-35, 43 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fgene.2015.00148 | [Y] - VÉTIZOU et al., "Anticancer immunotherapy by CTLA-4 blockade relies on the gut microbiota", Science, (20151105), vol. 350, no. 6264, pages 1079 - 1084, XP055310374 [Y] 18-25, 40 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.aad1329 | by applicant | US2015238544 | WO2015166492 | - VETIZOU et al., Science, (20150000), vol. 350, no. 6264, pages 1079 - 1084 | - KRONKREPPEL, CURR, Gene Ther, (20120000), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 362 - 73 | - YI et al., Curr Gene Ther, (20110000), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 218 - 28 | - GOLDSPIEL et al., Clinical Pharmacy, (19930000), vol. 12, pages 488 - 505 | - WUWU, Biotherapy, (19910000), vol. 3, pages 87 - 95 | - TOLSTOSHEV, Ann. Rev. Pharmacol. Toxicol., (19930000), vol. 32, pages 573 - 596 | - MULLIGAN, Science, (19930000), vol. 260, pages 926 - 932 | - MORGANANDERSON, Ann. Rev. Biochem., (19930000), vol. 62, pages 191 - 217 | - MAY, TIBTECH, (19930000), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 155 - 215 | - COHEN et al., Meth. Enzymol., (19930000), vol. 217, pages 618 - 644 | - Cline, Pharmac. Ther., (19850000), vol. 29, pages 69 - 92 | - "NCBI SRA", Database accession no. PRJNA302832 |