EP3475970 - THIN FILM TRANSISTOR, DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND DISPLAY PANEL HAVING THE SAME, AND FABRICATING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Ordos Yuansheng Optoelectronics Co., Ltd. Ordos Equipment Manufacturing Base Dongsheng District Ordos, Inner Mongolia 017020 / CN | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Chaochao No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Chao No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Huafeng No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
ZHAO, Shengwei No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
SHUN, Bule No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
YANG, Lei No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 07 /
HU, Chongliang No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 08 /
YANG, Meng No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 09 /
LV, Jingping No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 10 /
XIE, Lin No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 11 /
SUN, Shimin No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 12 /
DING, Duolong No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 16869393.5 | 12.12.2016 | [2019/18] | WO2016CN109512 | Priority number, date | CN201610465623 | 23.06.2016 Original published format: CN201610465623 | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017219621 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3475970 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L29/786 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
H01L27/1288 (EP,US);
H01L21/0273 (KR);
H01L29/66742 (CN);
H01L21/02532 (US);
H01L21/02592 (US);
H01L21/0262 (US);
H01L21/02675 (US);
H01L21/0274 (US);
H01L21/26513 (US);
H01L21/266 (US);
H01L27/1214 (US);
H01L27/1222 (US);
H01L27/1274 (US);
H01L29/167 (US);
H01L29/66757 (EP,US);
H01L29/66765 (US);
H01L29/786 (KR);
H01L29/78621 (EP,US);
H01L29/78633 (EP,US);
H01L29/78645 (EP,US);
H01L29/78675 (US);
H01L29/78678 (US);
H10K59/1213 (KR,US);
H10K71/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | H01L21/027, H01L21/336 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Title | German: | DÜNNSCHICHTTRANSISTOR, ANZEIGESUBSTRAT UND ANZEIGETAFEL DAMIT SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/18] | English: | THIN FILM TRANSISTOR, DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND DISPLAY PANEL HAVING THE SAME, AND FABRICATING METHOD THEREOF | [2019/18] | French: | TRANSISTOR À COUCHES MINCES, SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE ET ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE LE COMPRENANT, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2017 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 14.10.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6072193 (OHNUMA HIDETO [JP], et al); | [X]US2001019127 (ISHIDA YUKIMASA [JP]); | [A]US2009111251 (MIYATA TAKASHI [JP]); | [XI]US2011101357 (NODA TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2013168683 (SEO MI-SEON [KR], et al); | [X]WO2014127575 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD [CN]); | [XP]US2016211284 (ZHANG FANGZHEN [CN]) |