EP3384491 - AUDIO ENCODING USING VIDEO INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATI Technologies ULC 1 Commerce Valley Drive East Markham, ON L3T 7X6 / CA | [2023/25] |
Former [2018/41] | For all designated states ATI Technologies ULC 1 Commerce Valley Drive East Markham, ON L3T 7X6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Tan 1 Commerce Valley Dr. East Markham, Ontario L3T 7X6 / CA | 02 /
BROWN, Randall 1 Commerce Valley Dr. East Markham, Ontario L3T 7X6 / CA | 03 /
KHAN, Yasser M. 1 Commerce Valley Dr. East Markham, Ontario L3T 7X6 / CA | 04 /
YE, Jianfei 1 Commerce Valley Dr. East Markham, Ontario L3T 7X6 / CA | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher Venner Shipley LLP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [2023/25] |
Former [2018/41] | Eve, Rosemary Margaret Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells Kent TN1 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16869432.1 | 21.10.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016CA51220 | Priority number, date | US201514955549 | 01.12.2015 Original published format: US201514955549 | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017091887 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384491 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3384491 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 08.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/40, H04N9/802, H04N9/804, H04N9/82, G10L19/22, H04N19/179, H04N19/87, H04N19/142 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G10L19/22 (EP,KR,US);
G06V20/41 (EP,US);
G10L21/055 (KR,US);
G11B20/00007 (KR,US);
H04N19/103 (KR,US);
H04N19/142 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/179 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/87 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/802 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | G10L19/22, H04N19/142, H04N21/233, H04N5/76, G06K9/00, H04N9/802, H04N9/804, H04N9/82, H04N19/179, H04N19/87 | ||
Former IPC [2018/41] | G10L19/22, H04N19/142, H04N21/233, H04N5/76 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUDIOCODIERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VIDEOINFORMATIONEN | [2018/41] | English: | AUDIO ENCODING USING VIDEO INFORMATION | [2018/41] | French: | CODAGE AUDIO UTILISANT DES INFORMATIONS VIDÉO | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 01.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | MC | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | LU | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/30] |
Former [2024/28] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008152310 (MIYAGOSHI EIJI [JP]) [Y] 1-4,6-11,13-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0013] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0043] * * paragraph [0050] ** figures 1-3 *; | [XYI]US2014233917 (XIANG PEI [US]) [X] 1-4,7-12,14,15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0046] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0060] * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraphs [0074] - [0085] * * paragraphs [0105] - [0107] * * paragraphs [0110] - [0111] * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 1-4,6-11,13-15 [I] 5 | International search | [A]US5617145 (HUANG SI J [SG], et al) [A] 1-23* whole document*; | [X]US8311120 (KAUSHIK VINOD [US]) [X] 1-23 * whole document*; | [A]US8780978 (POLISETTY CHANDRA MOULI [IN], et al) [A] 1-23 * whole document*; | [A]US2014233917 (XIANG PEI [US]) [A] 1-23 * whole document* | Examination | JP2009098510 | by applicant | US2008152310 | JP2009098510 | US2014233917 |