EP3385397 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GRAIN-ORIENTED ELECTROMAGNETIC STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKENAKA, Masanori c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
HAYAKAWA, Yasuyuki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
IMAMURA, Takeshi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 04 /
EHASHI, Yuiko c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2024/01] |
Former [2018/41] | 01 /
TAKENAKA Masanori c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
HAYAKAWA Yasuyuki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | |||
03 /
IMAMURA Takeshi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | |||
04 /
EHASHI Yuiko c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 16870734.7 | 30.11.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016JP85616 | Priority number, date | JP20150237995 | 04.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015237995 | [2018/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017094797 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3385397 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3385397 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/12, B23K15/00, B23K26/352, C22C38/60, C22C38/02, C23C8/02, C23C8/26, C23C8/38, C23C8/50, C23C8/80, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, H01F1/16, C21D6/00, C23C8/24, C22C38/00 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
C21D8/1272 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
B23K15/00 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/352 (EP,KR,US);
C21D10/00 (KR);
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D8/12 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C21D8/1222 (EP,US);
C21D8/1233 (EP,US);
C21D8/1255 (EP,US);
C21D8/1261 (EP,US);
C21D8/1266 (EP,US);
C21D8/1283 (EP,US);
C21D8/1288 (EP,US);
C21D8/1294 (EP,US);
C22C38/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/008 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/60 (EP,RU,US);
C23C8/02 (EP,US);
C23C8/26 (EP,US);
C23C8/38 (EP,US);
C23C8/50 (EP,US);
C23C8/80 (EP,US);
H01F1/147 (US);
H01F1/14766 (KR);
H01F1/16 (EP,RU,US);
C21D2201/05 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | C21D8/12, C22C38/60, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, H01F1/16, C21D6/00, C23C8/24, C22C38/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/41] | C21D8/12, B23K15/00, B23K26/352, C22C38/00, C22C38/60, H01F1/147 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KORNORIENTIERTEN ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN STAHLBLECHS | [2018/41] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GRAIN-ORIENTED ELECTROMAGNETIC STEEL SHEET | [2018/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TÔLE D'ACIER ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE À GRAINS ORIENTÉS | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2018 | Translation filed | 19.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 19.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1281778 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 4,5* paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0101]; example 3 *; | [X]JP2003193135 (JFE STEEL KK) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0036]; table 2 *; | [Y]WO2015045397 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [Y] 3,5 * abstract *; | [XY]EP2902507 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL [CN]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; example 3; table 1 * [Y] 3,5; | [P]EP3050979 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0075]; tables 1-4 * | International search | [XY]JP2003193135 (JFE STEEL KK) [X] 1-3,6 * , claims; 0001, 0025, 0031 to 0032, 0036; table 2 (Family: none) * [Y] 4-8; | [XY]JP2003193131 (JFE STEEL KK) [X] 1-3 * , claims; 0001, 0024 to 0027, 0041 to 0044 (Family: none) * [Y] 4-8; | [XY]JP2003253335 (JFE STEEL KK) [X] 1-3,6 * , claims; 0001, 0033, 0041, 0050 to 0051; table 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 4-8; | [XYA]JP2012102344 (JFE STEEL CORP) [X] 3, 6, 8 * , claims; 0001, 0010, 0063 (Family: none) * [Y] 4-8 [A] 1-2; | [A]KR20120071823 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-8* , (Family: none) *; | [A]CN103725995 (UNIV NORTHEASTERN) [A] 1-8 * , & WO 2015/096430 A1 *; | [YA]JP2014208907 (JFE STEEL CORP) [Y] 7-8 * , claims; 0001, 0058 (Family: none) * [A] 1-6; | [YA]JP2015168869 (JFE STEEL CORP) [Y] 4-8 * , claims; 0001, 0009 to 0018, 0048, 0059 to 0060 (Family: none) * [A] 1-3; | [PXY]JP2016089194 (JFE STEEL CORP) [PX] 1-3,6-8 * , claims; 0001, 0051, 0055; table 2 & WO 2016/067636 A1 * [PY] 4-5; | [PXY]JP2016156069 (JFE STEEL CORP) [PX] 1-4, 6-8 * , claims; 0001, 0061, 0066, 0075; table 3 (Family: none) * [PY] 5 | by applicant | JPS4015644B | US1965559 | JPS5113469B | JP2782086B | JP2000129356 | - Y. USHIGAMI et al., "Precipitation Behaviors of Injected Nitride Inhibitors during Secondary Recrystallization Annealing in Grain Oriented Silicon Steel", Materials Science Forum, (19960000), vol. 204-206, pages 593 - 598 |