EP3383448 - SYSTEMS FOR THE CONDITIONING OF CEREBROSPINAL FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/41] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR THE CONDITIONING OF CEREBROSPINAL FLUID | ||
[2020/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minnetronix Inc. 1635 Energy Park Drive St. Paul, MN 55108 / US | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDSTROM, Blake 4100 Longfellow Ave. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55407 / US | 02 /
LAD, Shivanand 121 Crimson Oak Drive Durham, North Carolina 27713 / US | 03 /
MCCABE, Aaron 6300 Halifax Avenue S. Edina, Minnesota 55424 / US | 04 /
MEYERING, Emily 7639 W 14th Street St. Louis Park, Minnesota 55426 / US | 05 /
MONDRY, Jack 4212 Mavelle Drive Edina, Minnesota 55435 / US | 06 /
SAWHNEY, Ami 16191 NE 83rd Street, Unit C327 Redmond, WA 98052-4951 / US | 07 /
SCHEURER, Elizabeth 4941 Aldrich Avenue S. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55419 / US | 08 /
STOLL, Matt 5917 Girard Avenue S. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55419 / US | 09 /
VASE, Abhi 11330 Entrada Place Los Altos Hills, California 94024 / US | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/41] | 01 /
HEDSTROM, Blake 3500 Saint Paul Avenue Minneapolis, Minnesota 55416 / US | ||
02 /
LAD, Shivanand 121 Crimson Oak Drive Durham, North Carolina 27713 / US | |||
03 /
MCCABE, Aaron 6300 Halifax Avenue S. Edina, Minnesota 55424 / US | |||
04 /
MEYERING, Emily 7639 W 14th Street St. Louis Park, Minnesota 55426 / US | |||
05 /
MONDRY, Jack 4212 Mavelle Drive Edina, Minnesota 55435 / US | |||
06 /
SAWHNEY, Ami 16191 NE 83rd Street, Unit C327 Redmond, WA 98052-4951 / US | |||
07 /
SCHEURER, Elizabeth 4941 Aldrich Avenue S. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55419 / US | |||
08 /
STOLL, Matt 5917 Girard Avenue S. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55419 / US | |||
09 /
VASE, Abhi 11330 Entrada Place Los Altos Hills, California 94024 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 16871616.5 | 02.12.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016US64721 | Priority number, date | US201562263305P | 04.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562263305 P | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017096228 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3383448 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3383448 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61M1/34, A61M1/36, A61M27/00, G01N33/48, G01N33/543 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
A61M27/006 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0031 (US);
A61M2027/004 (EP);
A61M2202/0464 (EP);
A61M2205/053 (US);
A61M2205/054 (US);
A61M2205/3344 (US);
A61M2205/36 (US);
A61M2205/50 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR KONDITIONIERUNG VON LIQUOR | [2020/34] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR THE CONDITIONING OF CEREBROSPINAL FLUID | [2020/34] | French: | SYSTÈMES POUR LE CONDITIONNEMENT DU LIQUIDE CÉPHALORACHIDIEN | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/41] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONDITIONIERUNG VON LIQUOR | ||
Former [2018/41] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR THE CONDITIONING OF CEREBROSPINAL FLUID | ||
Former [2018/41] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE CONDITIONNEMENT DU LIQUIDE CÉPHALORACHIDIEN | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 07.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21152980.5 / EP3842080 | EP23167323.7 / EP4238593 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2016 | AL | 27.01.2021 | AT | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | CZ | 27.01.2021 | DK | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | FI | 27.01.2021 | HR | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | LV | 27.01.2021 | MC | 27.01.2021 | MK | 27.01.2021 | NL | 27.01.2021 | PL | 27.01.2021 | RO | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SE | 27.01.2021 | SI | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | NO | 27.04.2021 | GR | 28.04.2021 | IS | 27.05.2021 | PT | 27.05.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 02.12.2016 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 02.12.2016 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4695541 (TAYLOR PETER W [US]) [Y] 18 * entire document *; | [A]US2004068221 (SILVERBERG GERALD [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]US2010260815 (KYLE MATTHEW R [US], et al) [Y] 6 * entire document *; | [XY]WO2010123558 (NEUROFLUIDICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1, 12, 13, 16 * entire document * [Y] 2, 5-11, 14, 15, 17-19; | [Y]US2010305492 (LAD SHIVANAND [US], et al) [Y] 19 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011098623 (ZHANG ZHONGJU JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 14, 15, 17 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012234694 (VECITIS CHAD D [US], et al) [Y] 2, 5 * entire document *; | [Y]US2015094644 (LENIHAN TIM [CZ], et al) [Y] 9-11 * entire document *; | [Y]US2015328295 (LODGE JENNIFER [US], et al) [Y] 7, 8 * entire document * | by applicant | WO2010123558 | US8435204 | - JOHN R. PERFECT, "the Yeast that Likes It Hot, 6 FEMS YEAST RES", Cryptococcus neoformans, (20060000), pages 463 - 468 | - A. MADEIRA-LOPES et al., "Comparative study of the temperature profiles of growth and death of the pathogenic yeast Cryptococcus neoformans and the non-pathogenic Cryptococcus albidus", J. BASIC MICROBIOL, (19860000), vol. 26, pages 43 - 47 | - CRISTIANO L. DIAS et al., "The hydrophobic effect and its role in cold denaturation", CRYOBIOLOGY, (20100000), vol. 60, pages 91 - 99 | - GABRIEL CHEVREFILS et al., "UV Dose Required to Achieve Incremental Log Inactivation of Bacteria, Protozoa and Viruses", IUVANEWS, (20060300), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 38 - 45 | - RENATO PRATES et al., "Photodynamic therapy can kill Cryptococcus neoformans in in vitro and in vivo models", PROC. OF SPIE, (20090000), vol. 7165 | - "Cerebral Glioblastoma with Cerebrospinal Fluid Dissemination", NEUROSURGERY, (19891000), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 533 - 540 | - JED W. PITERA et al., "Dielectric Properties of Proteins from Simulation: The Effects of Solvent, Ligands, pH, and Temperature", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, (20010600), vol. 80, no. 6, pages 2546 - 55 | - KI-HO HAN et al., "Lateral-Driven Continuous Dielectrophoretic Microseparators for Blood Cells Suspended in a Highly Conductive Medium", LAB ON A CHIP, (20080627), vol. 8, no. 7, pages 1079 - 86 | - STEPHEN B. BAUMANN et al., "The Electrical Conductivity of Human Cerebrospinal Fluid at Body Temperature", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (19970300), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 220 - 23, XP011006345 | - Y. HUANG et al., "Electrode Design for Negative Dielectrophoresis", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (19911201), vol. 2, no. 12, doi:10.1088/0957-0233/2/12/005, pages 1142 - 46, XP000275317 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/2/12/005 | - BENJAMIN Y. PARK et al., "3-D Electrode Designs for Flow-through Dielectrophoretic Systems", ELECTROPHORESIS, (20051000), vol. 26, no. 19, pages 3745 - 57 | - D. CHEN et al., "A 3D Paired Microelectrode Array for Accumulation and Separation of Microparticles", J. OF MICROMECHANICS AND MICROENGINEERING, (20060701), vol. 16, no. 7, doi:10.1088/0960-1317/16/7/008, page 1162, XP020105041 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0960-1317/16/7/008 |