EP3387736 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTEGRATED MICROGRID MANAGEMENT SYSTEM IN ELECTRIC POWER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Opus One Solutions Energy Corp. 50 West Pearce St. Unit 16 Richmond Hill, Ontario L4B 1C5 / CA | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Joshua Unit 305 18 Rean Drive Toronto Ontario M2K 0C7 / CA | 02 /
TAI, Cedric Unit 2701 38 Grenville St. Toronto Ontario M4Y 1A5 / CA | 03 /
IRAVANI, Reza Dermott Place Toronto Ontario M3A 3B5 / CA | 04 /
GRAOVAC, Milan 41 Sylvan Valleyway Toronto Ontario M5M 4M4 / CA | 05 /
WANG, Xiaolin 1143 Dufferin Street Toronto Ontario M6H 4B7 / CA | 06 /
HARISUTHAN, Subramaniam 845 Manning Avenue Toronto Ontario M6G 2X1 / CA | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Cordina, Kevin John Simmons & Simmons LLP CityPoint One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16871866.6 | 07.12.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016CA51436 | Priority number, date | US201514961326 | 07.12.2015 Original published format: US201514961326 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017096477 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3387736 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00, G05B19/042, H04L12/28 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2639 (EP,US);
Y02B70/30 (US);
Y04S20/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR INTEGRIERTES MIKRONETZMANAGEMENTSYSTEM IN ELEKTRISCHEN ENERGIESYSTEMEN | [2018/42] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTEGRATED MICROGRID MANAGEMENT SYSTEM IN ELECTRIC POWER SYSTEMS | [2018/42] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR UN SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE MICRO-RÉSEAU INTÉGRÉ DANS DES SYSTÈMES ÉLECTRIQUES | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 06.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/19] | 17.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/19] | 23.12.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP23157923.6 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.08.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 27.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 27.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 27.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - JOHANNES SCHIFFER ET AL, "Modeling of microgrids - from fundamental physics to phasors and voltage sources", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20150501), XP080802206 [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-15 | International search | [A]WO2013015773 (PETRA SOLAR INC [US], et al) [A] 1-113* -see abstract; -see figs. 1, 4-6, 15; -see whole document. *; | [A]US2013041516 (ROCKENFELLER UWE [US], et al) [A] 1-113 * -see abstract; -see figs. 1-7; -see whole document. *; | [Y]US8649914 (MILLER LANDON CABELL GARLAND [US], et al) [Y] 1-113 * -see abstract; -see figs. 1-15; -see whole document. *; | [XY]US8682495 (CARRALERO MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-113 * -see abstract; -see col. 2, line 35 through col. 15,21; -see figs. 1-6 * [Y] 0; | [Y]US2014252855 (WATANABE TOHRU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-113 * -see abstract; sections [0091-0101]; -see figs. 1-5, 7 & 9; -see whole document. *; | [A]US2014297051 (ZHANG HUAGUANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-113 * -see abstract; -see figs. 1-8, 10-12; -see whole document. *; | [A]US2014300182 (JAMES HARRY K [US]) [A] 1-113 * -see abstract; -see figs. 1-2; -see whole document. *; | [Y] - PRAIS et al., "A Topology Processor That Tracks Network Modifications Over Time'';", IEEE Transactions on Power Systems, (19880800), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 992 - 998, XP055389504 [Y] 1-113 * . -see abstract; -see figs. 1-4. * | by applicant | WO2013015773 | - SCHIFFER, Modeling of microgrids-from fundamental physics to phasors and voltage sources | - SANSEVERINO, Optimal power flow in three-phase islanded microgrids with inverter interfaced units |