EP3388407 - POWDER PARTICLES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GREEN BODY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/42] | POWDER PARTICLES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GREEN WORK USING SAME | ||
[2021/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Toyohashi University of Technology 1-1 Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTO, Hiroyuki c/o National University Corporation TOYOHASHI UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY 1-1, Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | 02 /
MATSUDA, Atsunori c/o National University Corporation TOYOHASHI UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY 1-1, Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMURA, Go c/o National University Corporation TOYOHASHI UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY 1-1, Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | 04 /
MATSUSAKI, Tatsuya c/o National University Corporation TOYOHASHI UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY 1-1, Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | [2022/06] |
Former [2018/42] | 01 /
MUTO Hiroyuki c/o National University Corporation TOYOHASHI UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY 1-1 Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUDA Atsunori c/o National University Corporation TOYOHASHI UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY 1-1 Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWAMURA Go c/o National University Corporation TOYOHASHI UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY 1-1 Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUSAKI Tatsuya c/o National University Corporation TOYOHASHI UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY 1-1 Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 16873143.8 | 11.12.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016JP86828 | Priority number, date | JP20150242743 | 11.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015242743 | [2018/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017099250 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3388407 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3388407 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/628, B22F1/02, B22F3/02, B22F9/14, B22F1/00, C04B35/653 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
B22F3/02 (EP,US);
B22F1/00 (EP,US);
B22F1/065 (EP,US);
B22F1/102 (EP,US);
B22F1/103 (EP,US);
B22F3/03 (US);
B22F9/24 (US);
B33Y70/10 (EP,US);
C04B35/62625 (EP,US);
C04B35/62655 (EP,US);
C04B35/628 (US);
C04B35/62802 (EP,US);
C04B35/62805 (US);
C04B35/62813 (EP,US);
C04B35/62844 (EP,US);
C04B35/62881 (EP,US);
C04B35/62892 (EP,US);
C04B35/63424 (EP,US);
C04B35/63432 (EP,US);
C04B35/63444 (EP,US);
C04B35/645 (EP,US);
C04B35/653 (US);
B22F2003/145 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F3/225 (US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/604 (EP,US);
C04B2235/61 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | C04B35/628, B22F1/02, B22F3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PULVERPARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GRÜNKÖRPERS | [2022/08] | English: | POWDER PARTICLES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GREEN BODY USING SAME | [2021/51] | French: | PARTICULES DE POUDRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PIÈCE VERTE UTILISANT LESDITES PARTICULES | [2018/42] |
Former [2018/42] | PULVERPARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RÜNEN WERKSTÜCKS DAMIT | ||
Former [2018/42] | POWDER PARTICLES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GREEN WORK USING SAME | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2018 | Translation filed | 11.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 11.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2016 | AL | 09.02.2022 | AT | 09.02.2022 | CY | 09.02.2022 | CZ | 09.02.2022 | DK | 09.02.2022 | EE | 09.02.2022 | ES | 09.02.2022 | FI | 09.02.2022 | HR | 09.02.2022 | IT | 09.02.2022 | LT | 09.02.2022 | LV | 09.02.2022 | MC | 09.02.2022 | MK | 09.02.2022 | MT | 09.02.2022 | NL | 09.02.2022 | PL | 09.02.2022 | RO | 09.02.2022 | RS | 09.02.2022 | SE | 09.02.2022 | SI | 09.02.2022 | SK | 09.02.2022 | SM | 09.02.2022 | TR | 09.02.2022 | BG | 09.05.2022 | NO | 09.05.2022 | GR | 10.05.2022 | IS | 09.06.2022 | PT | 09.06.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.12.2016 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
TR | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 11.12.2016 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 11.12.2016 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.12.2016 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
NO | 09.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003127157 (IYODA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [X] 2-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] - [0013] - [0030] , [0031] , [0035] - [0041] - [0047] - [0050]; figure 2 * [Y] 13-15; | [A]US2004038067 (OZAKI YUKIKO [JP], et al) [A] 2-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0051] - [0056]; figures 1,3; claims 1-21 *; | [A]JP2006097123 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 2-11,13-15* paragraphs [0086] - [0088] - [0118] *; | [XDY]US2015190840 (MUTO HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [XD] 2-10 * paragraphs [0081] - [0085] - [0126]; figure 13 * [Y] 13-15 | International search | [A]JPH03112845 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO) [A] 1-15* , fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2002160975 (TOTO LTD) [Y] 12, 15 * , claims; paragraphs [0020], [0026], [0027] & US 2003/0013794 A1 paragraphs [0041], [0044], [0053]; claims & WO 2001/072659 A1 & AU 4467901 A & CA 2385993 A * [A] 1-11, 13-14; | [XA]WO2007011038 (KROSAKI HARIMA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1 * , paragraph [0020]; fig. 1 & US 2009/0044723 A1 fig. 1; paragraph [0032] & EP 1918265 A1 & CA 2616253 A & CN 101253130 A & AU 2006270715 A & KR 10-2008-0036950 A * [A] 2-15; | [A]JP2010064945 (UNIV TOYOHASHI TECHNOLOGY, et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2012101951 (UNIV TOYOHASHI TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 12, 15 * , paragraphs [0048] to [0081]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [A] 1-11, 13-14 | by applicant | JPH07157808 | JPH08134504 | JP2006521264 | WO2012133696 | - JIN ISAKARI; SATOSHI KATO; GO KAWAMURA; ATSUNORI MATSUDA; HIROYUKI MUTO, P14-(C) of Proceedings of the 50th Summer Seminar 2015 of the Association of Tokai Young Ceramists |