EP3387314 - FLUID TRANSPORT COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation 31500 Solon Road Solon, OH 44139 / US | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNYDER, Mitchell L. 880 Kaypat Drive Hope, Michigan 48628 / US | 02 /
CASSIDAY, Bryan L. 2525 Dale Road Beaverton, Michigan 48612 / US | 03 /
NADENOFF, Nicolas 3497 Dale Road Beaverton, Michigan 48612 / US | 04 /
NIXON, Thomas R. P.O. Box 403 Au Gres, Michigan 48703 / US | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 16873986.0 | 09.12.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016US65971 | Priority number, date | US201562265861P | 10.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562265861 P | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017100672 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3387314 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16L25/00, F16L47/26, F16L55/00, A61M39/10, F16L39/00 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
A61M39/105 (EP,US);
F16L11/22 (CN);
F16L37/56 (CN,US);
F16L11/04 (CN);
F16L39/00 (EP,US);
F16L39/02 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | F16L25/00, F16L47/26, F16L55/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | FLUIDTRANSPORTKOPPLUNG | [2018/42] | English: | FLUID TRANSPORT COUPLING | [2018/42] | French: | COUPLEUR DE TRANSPORT DE FLUIDE | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 03.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5236227 (ADAMS ROBERT [US], et al); | [XI]US2012223517 (MORRISSEY MARTIN [US], et al); | [X]EP2805737 (PALL CORP [US]) | International search | [A]US5236227 (ADAMS ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US2009051164 (LIRSCH DOMINIK [AT], et al); | [A]US2013304039 (CHUNG TERRY [US]); | [A]US2014261747 (BARES WILLIAM [US], et al); | [X]EP2805737 (PALL CORP [US]) |