EP3389557 - TRANSSEPTAL DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neovasc Tiara Inc. 2135-13700 Mayfield Pl Richmond, BC V6V 2E4 / CA | [2022/28] |
Former [2022/24] | For all designated states Neovasc Tiara Inc. 2135- 13700 Mayfield PI Richmond, BC V6V 2E4 / CA | ||
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states Neovasc Tiara Inc. 13562 Maycrest Way No. 5138 Richmond, BC V6V 2J7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYULI, Colin A. 16-784 Thurlow Street Vancouver British Columbia V6E 1V9 / CA | 02 /
LANE, Randy Matthew 20557 Grade Crescent Langley British Columbia V3A 4K1 / CA | 03 /
WONG, Karen Tsoek-Ji 117-8640 Ackroyd Road Richmond British Columbia V6X 3E9 / CA | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/28] |
Former [2018/43] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16874205.4 | 15.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016CA51482 | Priority number, date | US201562267722P | 15.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562267722 P | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017100927 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3389557 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3389557 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02, A61F2/00, A61F2/24, A61F2/95, A61F2/966, A61M25/01, A61M25/09, A61M25/092 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
A61F2/2436 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/2433 (CN);
A61F2/2418 (EP,US);
A61F2/2427 (US);
A61F2/2439 (CN);
A61M25/0054 (US);
A61M25/0074 (US);
A61M25/0133 (US);
A61M25/09 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSSEPTALES VERABREICHUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/43] | English: | TRANSSEPTAL DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2018/43] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION TRANS-SEPTALE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 12.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22176552.2 / EP4112006 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2016 | AL | 13.07.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | CY | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | MK | 13.07.2022 | MT | 13.07.2022 | PL | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | IE | 15.12.2022 | LU | 15.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 15.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 15.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 15.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 15.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2010045297 (MEDTRONIC COREVALVE LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 9; figures 3A-3G *; | [I]WO2013056898 (JENAVALVE TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 39, lines 1-37 * * page 96, line 33 - page 106, line 21; figures 24A,24B,27A,27B,28A,28B * * page 120, line 16 - page 124, line 11; figures 41A-41F *; | [A]WO2015038875 (ABBOTT CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0210]; figure 11 * | International search | [XY]US2009234443 (OTTMA RUEDIGER [DE], et al) [X] 1, 4-10, 14, 31-35 *figures 1-6,paragraphs [0026], [0039], [0059], [0083], [0094]* [Y] 2; | [A]WO2011126758 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14, 31-35*figure 2, paragraphs [22], [28]*; | [Y]WO2013075215 (NEOVASC INC [CA], et al) [Y] 2 *figures 11A-11D, paragraphs [0013], [0082]-[0084]*; | [A]US2014172086 (QUADRI ARSHAD [US], et al) [A] 1-14, 31-35 *figures 11-13, paragraphs [0122]-[0124]*; | [XY]US2015306358 (DUFFY NIALL [IE], et al) [X] 1, 7, 9, 10, 14 *figure 1, paragraphs [0006], [0026]* [Y] 2 | by applicant | WO2013056898 | US2015342736 |