EP3393124 - IMAGING METHOD OF IMAGE SENSOR, IMAGING APPARATUS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAO, Shuijiang No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Xianqing No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16874698.0 | 22.11.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016CN106800 | Priority number, date | CN201510925379 | 14.12.2015 Original published format: CN201510925379 | [2018/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017101641 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393124 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/04, H04N5/225, H01L27/148, H04N5/33, H04N5/351 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
H01L27/14609 (EP,US);
H01L27/148 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (US);
H04N23/11 (EP,US);
H04N23/84 (US);
H04N23/843 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | H04N9/04, H04N5/225, H01L27/148 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | ABBILDUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR BILDSENSOR, ABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2018/43] | English: | IMAGING METHOD OF IMAGE SENSOR, IMAGING APPARATUS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2018/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE DE CAPTEUR D'IMAGE, APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2018 | Translation filed | 05.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 05.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013188057 (LIN CHUN-TA [TW]); | [Y]US2013329101 (CHOI EUN-CHEOL [KR], et al) |