EP3392904 - CHIP-BONDING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Micro Electronics Equipment (Group) Co., Ltd. 1525 Zhangdong Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Yonghui 1525 Zhangdong Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
TANG, Shiyi 1525 Zhangdong Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
LI, Huili 1525 Zhangdong Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16874862.2 | 15.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016CN110057 | Priority number, date | CN201510938394 | 15.12.2015 Original published format: CN201510938394 | [2018/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017101805 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3392904 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/67, H01L21/56, H01L21/683, // H01L23/544 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
H01L21/67144 (EP,US);
H01L21/67092 (KR);
H01L21/67121 (CN,US);
H01L21/561 (CN);
H01L21/563 (CN,KR);
H01L21/67259 (KR);
H01L21/67282 (KR);
H01L21/67712 (KR);
H01L21/68 (KR);
H01L21/6835 (EP,US);
H01L24/75 (US);
H01L24/83 (US);
H01L2221/68309 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68354 (EP,US);
H01L2223/54426 (EP,US);
H01L2223/54486 (EP,US);
H01L2224/7565 (EP,US);
H01L2224/7598 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8313 (US);
H01L2224/83203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/951 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | H01L21/67, H01L21/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | CHIPVERBINDUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2018/43] | English: | CHIP-BONDING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2018/43] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION DE PUCE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2018 | Translation filed | 04.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 04.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008085571 (TONG HO-MING [TW], et al) [A] 1,12 * figure 1 ** paragraphs [0015] - [0028] *; | [I]WO2012133760 (BONDTECH CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-13 * figures 4-19 and the associated text *; | [A]US2013071220 (KURODA NAO [JP]) [A] 1,12 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0019] *; | [A]US2013167369 (OH JOO-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1,12 * figures 4, 6 * * paragraphs [0060] - [0068] *; | [I]US2015228622 (KOYANAGI MITSUMASA [JP], et al) [I] 1-13 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0083] - [0090] * |