EP3390687 - A COATING PRECURSOR NOZZLE AND A NOZZLE HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beneq OY Olarinluoma 9 02200 Espoo / FI | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOININEN, Pekka T. C/O Beneq Oy Olarinluoma 9 02200 Espoo / FI | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Primrose Oy Unioninkatu 24 00130 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 16874970.3 | 15.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016FI50874 | Priority number, date | FI20150005962 | 17.12.2015 Original published format: FI 20155962 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017103333 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3390687 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455, C23C16/54, C23C16/44 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
C23C16/45574 (EP,US);
C23C16/4408 (EP,US);
C23C16/45551 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | C23C16/455, C23C16/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSVORLÄUFERDÜSE UND DÜSENKOPF | [2018/43] | English: | A COATING PRECURSOR NOZZLE AND A NOZZLE HEAD | [2018/43] | French: | BUSE DE PRÉCURSEUR DE REVÊTEMENT ET TÊTE DE BUSE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 27.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.02.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014127363 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0063]; figure 12 * [I] 3-15; | [A]WO2014132892 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2a, 2b * | International search | [A]WO2014127363 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0057]-[0063] ; figs. 7, 9, 11 *; | [A]US2011076421 (LEE SANG IN [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0118]; fig. 24A *; | [A]WO2013121102 (BENEQ OY [FI]) [A] 1-16 * p. 5, line 25 - p. 6, line 13 *; | [PA]WO2016005661 (BENEQ OY [FI]) [PA] 1-16 * figs. 4, 6-8 * |