EP3390646 - A NOVEL PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED RECOMBINANT CHOLERA TOXIN B (rCTB) AND FORMU LATION THEREON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Msd Wellcome Trust Hilleman Laboratories Pvt. Ltd. D-15 Ground Floor Jangpura Extension New Delhi 110014 / IN | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Tarun WZ-37 Second Floor Hari Singh Park New Multan Nagar New Delhi 110056 / IN | 02 /
JOSHI, Neeraj A1/93 Gali No. 3 Rajapuri Uttam Nagar New Delhi 110059 / IN | 03 /
KANCHAN, Vibhu Pocket D Flat No. 211 Ground Floor Sarita Vihar New Delhi 110076 / IN | 04 /
SIKRIWAL, Deepa Pocket D Flat no. 211 Ground Floor Sarita Vihar New Delhi New Delhi 110076 / IN | 05 /
SHUKLA, Nidhi A062 G. C Grand Apartments Vaibhav Khand Indirapuram Ghaziabad Uttar Pradesh Ghaziabad 201014 / IN | 06 /
GILL, Dr. Davinder E-9/16 Ground Floor Vasant Vihar New Delhi New Delhi 110057 / IN | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Novitas Patent AB P.O. Box 55557 102 04 Stockholm / SE | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16874999.2 | 09.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016IB57460 | Priority number, date | IN2015DEL4089 | 14.12.2015 Original published format: IN 4089DE2015 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017103748 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3390646 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12P1/04, C07K14/28, A61P31/04 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
A61K39/107 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP,US);
C12P1/04 (US);
C12P21/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/521 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | C12P1/04, C07K14/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEREINIGTEM REKOMBINANTEM CHOLERATOXIN B (RCTB) UND FORMULIERUNG DARAUS | [2018/43] | English: | A NOVEL PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED RECOMBINANT CHOLERA TOXIN B (rCTB) AND FORMU LATION THEREON | [2018/43] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE TOXINE B DE CHOLÉRA, RECOMBINANTE, PURIFIÉE (TBCR) ET FORMULATION CORRESPONDANTE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 07.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]RU2456996 (FEDERAL NOE G UCHREZHDENIE ZDRAVOOKHRANENIJA ROSSIJSKIJ NI PROTIVOCHUMNYJ INST MIKROB FEDERAL NOJ SL [RU]) [A] 1-11; | [A] - C Bergquist ET AL, "Intranasal vaccination of humans with recombinant cholera toxin B subunit induces systemic and local antibody responses in the upper respiratory tract and the vagina", Infection and Immunity, United States, (19970701), pages 2676 - 2684, URL: https://iai.asm.org/content/iai/65/7/2676.full.pdf, XP055585512 [A] 1-6 | [Y] - SANCHEZ J ET AL, "RECOMBINANT SYSTEM FOR OVEREXPRESSION OF CHOLERA TOXIN B SUBUNIT IN VIBRIO CHOLERAE AS A BASIS FOR VACCINE DEVELOPMENT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (19890101), vol. 86, doi:10.1073/PNAS.86.2.481, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 481 - 485, XP009042243 [Y] 1-5,7-11 * page 482, column left * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.2.481 | [Y] - KRYSTAL TEASLEY HAMORSKY ET AL, "Rapid and Scalable Plant-based Production of a Cholera Toxin B Subunit Variant to Aid in Mass Vaccination against Cholera Outbreaks", PLOS NEGLECTED TROPICAL DISEASES, (20130307), vol. 7, no. 3, doi:10.1371/journal.pntd.0002046, page e2046, XP055535643 [Y] 1-5,7-11 * page 3, column right * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pntd.0002046 | [A] - JOHN CLEMENS ET AL, "New-generation vaccines against cholera", NATURE REVIEWS / GASTROENTEROLOGY & HEPATOLOGY, US, (20111108), vol. 8, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nrgastro.2011.174, ISSN 1759-5045, pages 701 - 710, XP055585502 [A] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrgastro.2011.174 | [Y] - Holmgren, "Single-strain improved oral cholera vaccine", (20150101), URL: https://www.msb.se/RibData/Filer/pdf/27943.pdf, (20190503), XP055585428 [Y] 1-5,7-11 * page 10 * | [Y] - M. BOUSTANSHENAS ET AL, "Investigation into immunological responses against a native recombinant CTB whole-cell Vibrio cholerae vaccine in a rabbit model", JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY., GB, (20130201), vol. 114, no. 2, doi:10.1111/jam.12043, ISSN 1364-5072, pages 509 - 515, XP055392332 [Y] 1-5,7-11 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jam.12043 | International search | [Y] - "Single-strain improved oral cholera vaccine", Scientific report- Jan Holmgren, Sara Brunnberg, (20150900), XP055549131 [Y] 1-11 * . *refer page 10, paragraph 3; page 10, paragraph 1; page 12, paragrapgh 1 lines 9-12* | [Y] - M. BOUSTANSHENAS et al., "Investigation into immunological responses against a native recombinant CTB whole- cell Vibrio cholerae vaccine in a rabbit model", Journal of Applied Microbiology, (20130200), vol. 114, no. 2, pages 509 - 515, XP 055392332 [Y] 1-11 *refer material and method, Abstract* | [Y] - P. SLOS et al., "Recombinant Cholera Toxin B-Subunit in Escherichia coli: High-Level Secretion, Purification, and Characterization", Protein Expression and Purification, (19941000), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 518 - 526, XP 024799899 [Y] 1-11 * . *refer whole document* |