EP3391807 - LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACHIDA, Ryo c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16875291.3 | 09.11.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016JP83283 | Priority number, date | JP20150243140 | 14.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015243140 | [2018/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017104307 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3391807 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/06 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
A61B1/0638 (EP,US);
A61B1/0655 (EP,US);
G02B23/2469 (US);
G02B23/26 (US);
G02B27/141 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | A61B1/06, G02B23/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2018/43] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE | [2018/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2018 | Translation filed | 09.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 09.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011257484 (MIZUYOSHI AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0090]; figures 12A, 12B, 13A, 13B, 14 *; | [Y]US2013193875 (GODO HIROKAZU [JP]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1, 2, 8A-8C *; | [A]US2013329224 (TAKAOKA HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0061] ** paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0077]; figures 3, 4, 6, 9 *; | [XY]US2015092033 (KURAMOTO MASAYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0098]; figures 1, 2, 5 * [Y] 3,4 | International search | [A]JP2001208986 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-6* , abstract; paragraphs [0001] to [0010], [0061]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012509098 (Stryker Corp.) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0023]; fig. 1 & WO 2010/059197 A2 paragraphs [0023] to [0028]; fig. 1 & US 2011/0208004 A1 & EP 2365773 A2 & CA 2741734 A1 & CN 102215736 A & KR 10-2011-0094283 A *; | [A]WO2015064470 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0003], [0005], [0020] to [0029], [0034], [0056] to [0057]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2016/0235285 A1 & JP 5927348 B2 & EP 3050492 A1 & CN 105682536 A * | by applicant | JP2012509098 |