EP3390744 - A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 64 Viken / SE | [2021/27] |
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOO, Christian Tvärgatan 8 SE-268 77 Kågeröd / SE | 02 /
JOSEFSSON, Per Bruzeliusgatan 2 SE-256 54 Ramlösa / SE | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 64 Viken / SE | [2024/34] |
Former [2018/43] | Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | Application number, filing date | 16876159.1 | 15.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016SE51272 | Priority number, date | SE20150051670 | 17.12.2015 Original published format: SE 1551670 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017105335 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3390744 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3390744 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, E04F15/10 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
E04F15/02038 (EP,EA,KR,US);
E04F13/0894 (EA,KR,US);
E04F15/02005 (EA,KR,US);
E04F15/102 (EP,EA,US);
E04F15/105 (EP,EA,KR,US);
E04F2201/0138 (EP,EA,US);
E04F2201/0146 (EP,EA,KR,US);
E04F2201/023 (EP,EA,US);
E04F2201/042 (EP,EA,KR,US);
E04F2201/043 (EP,EA,KR,US);
E04F2201/0535 (EP,EA,KR,US);
E04F2201/0547 (EP,EA,KR,US);
E04F2201/0588 (EP,EA,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | E04F15/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MECHANISCHEN VERRIEGELUNGSSYSTEMS FÜR PLATTEN | [2018/43] | English: | A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR PANELS | [2018/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE MÉCANIQUE DESTINÉ À DES PANNEAUX | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 13.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2006043893 (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE], et al); | [XI]WO2006104436 (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE], et al); | [AD]WO2007081267 (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE], et al); | [XI]US2013008118 (BAERT THOMAS L M [BE], et al); | [AD]WO2014209213 (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE]); | [I]US2015252573 (DEVOS PIETER [BE]) | International search | [A]WO2008008016 (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE], et al); | [X]DE202004021867U (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE]); | [A]WO2013151493 (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE]); | [A]US2014366476 (PERVAN DARKO [SE], et al); | [A]US2015330088 (DERELOV PETER [SE]) | by applicant | WO2006043893 | WO2007015669 | WO2014182215 | WO2014209213 |