EP3389664 - CAFFEINE INHIBITORS OF MTHFD2 AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raze Therapeutics, Inc. 400 Technology Square 10th Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states Raze Therapeutics Inc. 400 Technology Square 10th Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAINOLFI, Nello 12 Oakley Raod Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 02 /
MOYER, Mikel, P. 21 Atherton Road Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 03 /
SAIAH, Eddine 19 Kenwood Street Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 04 /
LECCI, Cristina 114 Innovation Drive Milton Park; Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RZ / GB | 05 /
PACE, Robert, David, Matthew 114 Innovation Drive Milton Park; Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RZ / GB | 06 /
TYE, Heather 114 Innovation Drive Milton Park; Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RZ / GB | 07 /
VILE, Julia 114 Innovation Drive Milton Park; Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RZ / GB | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16876595.6 | 14.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016US66666 | Priority number, date | US201562266802P | 14.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562266802 P | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017106352 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3389664 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/522, A61P35/02, A61P35/04 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
C07D473/30 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07D473/18 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | KOFFEININHIBITOREN VON MTHFD2 UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2018/43] | English: | CAFFEINE INHIBITORS OF MTHFD2 AND USES THEREOF | [2018/43] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE CAFÉINE DE MTHFD2 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 13.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3094529 ; | [X]DE1938016 (FISCHER OHG ARZNEIMITTELWERK); | [X]US6020337 (LEIGH ALISTAIR J [US], et al); | [X]WO0116134 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US]); | [X]WO2004106337 (CV THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [X]WO2005021548 (ADENOSINE THERAPEUTICS LLC [US], et al); | [X]WO2006091897 (ADENOSINE THERAPEUTICS LLC [US], et al); | [X]US7253176 (WAER MARK JOZEF ALBERT [BE], et al); | [X]US2007197563 (SCHOENAFINGER KARL [DE], et al); | [X]WO2009024542 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al); | [X]WO2011005871 (PGXHEALTH LLC [US], et al); | [X]CN102993203 (WENZHOU MEDICAL COLLEGE) | International search | [X]US2009023704 (CHENG LEIFENG [SE], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-8, 18-19 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0047], [0049], [0055], [0046], [0061], [0670]-[0671], [0737], [0754] * [] 9-16, 20/1-3, 20/5-16, 21/1-3, 21/5-16, 22/1-3, 22/5-16, 23/22/1-3, 23/22/5-16, 24/23/22/1-3, 24/23/22/5-16, 25/23/22/1-3, 25/23/22/5-16, 26/23/22/1-3, 26/23/22/5-16, 27/23/22/1-3, 27/23/22/5-16, 28/2; | [Y]US2009105282 (PICKETT CECIL [US], et al) [Y] 9-16, 20/9-16, 21/9-16, 22/9-16, 23/22/9-16, 24/23/22/9-16, 25/23/22/9-16, 26/23/22/9-16, 27/23/22/9-16, 28/27/23/22/9-16 * ; paragraphs [0005], [0030] *; | [A]US8029770 (LU YAOPING [US], et al) [A] 1* ; entire publication *; | [Y]WO2014150688 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [Y] 20/1-16, 21/1-17, 22/1-16, 23/22/1-17, 24/23/22/1-17, 25/23/22/1-17, 26/23/22/1-17, 27/23/22/1-17, 28/27/23/22/1-17 * ; abstract; page 2, lines 5-15, 25-30; page 6, lines 14-15; page 8, lines 15-20; page 9, lines 1-5; page 19, lines 25-30; page 45, lines 20-25; page 49, lines 10-25; figure 5 *; | [X] - FINGERT, HJ et al., "Cytotoxic, Cell Cycle, and Chromosomal Effects of Methylxanthines in Human Tumor Cells Treated with Alkylating Agents.", Cancer Research, (19860500), vol. 46, pages 2463 - 2467, XP055395143 [X] 1-4 20/4, 21/4, 22/4, 23/22/4, 24/23/22/4, 25/23/22/4, 26/23/22/4, 27/23/22/4, 28/27/23/22/4 * ; abstract; page 2463, column 1, paragraph 2; page 2463, column 2, paragraph 4; page 2467, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [XY] - PUBCHEM., (01181620), Database accession no. 110205319, XP055395146 [X] 1, 17 [Y] 20/17, 21/17, 22/17, 23/22/17, 24/23/22/17, 25/23/22/17, 26/23/22/17, 27/23/22/17, 28/27/23/22/17 | [XY] - PUBCHEM., (20050809), Database accession no. CID 3139419, XP055395152 [X] 1 [Y] 17, 20/17, 21/17, 22/17, 23/22/17, 24/23/22/17, 25/23/22/17, 26/23/22/17, 27/23/22/17, 28/27/23/22/17 | [Y] - DE NUNZIO, C et al., "The Controversial Relationship Between Benign Prostatic Hyperplasia and Prostate Cancer: The Role of Inflammation.", European urology, (20110700), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 106 - 117, XP028223808 [Y] 9-16 * ; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eururo.2011.03.055 | [Y] - WEINBERG, SE et al., "Targeting mitochondria metabolism for cancer therapy.", Nature Chemical Biology, (20150100), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 9 - 15, XP055395159 [Y] 20/17, 21/17, 22/17, 23/22/17, 24/23/22/17, 25/23/22/17, 26/23/22/17, 27/23/22/17, 28/27/23/22/17 * ; page 3, paragraph 3; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nchembio.1712 | by applicant | WO00142246 | FR901228 | US5639600 | US6020337 | WO0116134 | WO02088112 | US6552065 | WO03063794 | WO2004019973 | WO2004089925 | WO2004106337 | WO2004106328 | WO2005007623 | WO2005021548 | WO2005113554 | WO2006078846 | US7087648 | WO2006091897 | WO2006122806 | WO2007016176 | WO2007044729 | WO2007053452 | WO2007070514 | WO2007084786 | US7253176 | US2007197563 | WO2007129161 | WO2008039218 | US7390799 | WO2008109943 | WO2008118802 | WO2009024542 | WO2009114512 | WO2011005871 | WO2011090760 | US8138347 | CN102993203 | - S. M. BERGE et al., J. Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - HELLMAN et al., Principles of Radiation Therapy, Cancer, in Principles and Practice of Oncology, (19930000), vol. 1, pages 248 - 275 | - The Merck Index | - Collect. Czech. Chem. Commun., (19900000), vol. 55, pages 2257 - 2269 | - J. Med. Chem., (19960000), vol. 39, pages 2 - 9 | - J. Med. Chem., (19970000), vol. 40, pages 4396 - 4405 |