EP3391345 - WORN PERSONAL PROTECTIVE EQUIPMENT COMPLIANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corvex Connected Safety Inc. 7516 80th Street South Suite 101 Cottage Grove, MN 55016 / US | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'BRIEN, Joe 29 East Oaks Road North Oaks MN 55127 / US | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16876641.8 | 15.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016US66807 | Priority number, date | US201562267365P | 15.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562267365 P | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017106432 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3391345 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06Q10/06, G06Q50/04, G08B1/00 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G06Q50/265 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0635 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06395 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06398 (EP,US);
G06Q10/105 (EP,US);
G06Q30/018 (EP,US);
G06Q50/04 (EP,US);
G06T17/00 (US);
H04W84/042 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | G08B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | KONFORMITÄTSSYSTEM FÜR AM KÖRPER GETRAGENE PERSÖNLICHE SCHUTZAUSRÜSTUNG | [2018/43] | English: | WORN PERSONAL PROTECTIVE EQUIPMENT COMPLIANCE SYSTEM | [2018/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONFORMITÉ POUR ÉQUIPEMENT DE PROTECTION PERSONNEL PORTÉ | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 16.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.04.2021 | 28.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/38] | 20.05.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008144384 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, lines 9-16 * * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 5 * [I] 2-29; | [XI]WO2009032417 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 13, lines 11-24 * * page 17, lines 10-23 *[I] 2-29; | [XI]EP2860676 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-6,9,12,14,18,25 * paragraphs [0010] - [0016] - [0 19] , [0 20] , [0 26] - [0029] - [0 39] , [0 40] * [I] 7,8,10,11,13,15-17,19-24,26-29 | International search | [XY]US2007121937 (KOCHEVAR PETER D [US], et al) [X] 28-29 * , para. [0019], [0024]-[0029], [0032]-[0039], [0043], [0047], [0052], and [0054], and Fig. 1. * [Y] 1-27; | [Y]US2009226080 (BOYD MARTIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-27 * , para. [0033]. *; | [Y]US2012055815 (TRUEX BRYAN I [US], et al) [Y] 20 * , para. [0042] and [0050]. *; | [Y]US2013104046 (CASCO-ARIAS SANCHEZ LUIS B [US], et al) [Y] 21 * , para. [0052] and [0071]. *; | [Y]US2013314365 (WOOLLEY ADRIAN [CA], et al) [Y] 16-17, 24* , para. [0007], [0020], and [0026], and claim 7. *; | [Y]WO2015077418 (MOPHIE INC [US]) [Y] 7-8, 15-17, 24 * , para. [0035]-[0036], [0039], and [0043]. * |