EP3391284 - INTERPRETATION AND QUANTIFICATION OF EMERGENCY FEATURES ON HEAD COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUH, Esther L. 300 Berry Street Unit 553 San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | 02 /
MUKHERJEE, Pratik 300 Berry Street Unit 553 San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | 03 /
MANLEY, Geoffrey T. 1755 Toyon Road Lafayette, CA 94549 / US | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [2024/16] |
Former [2018/43] | Williams Powell 11 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 16876771.3 | 16.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016US67170 | Priority number, date | US201562269778P | 18.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562269778 P | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017106645 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3391284 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3391284 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T7/62, G06T7/68 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/501 (EP,US);
G06F18/217 (US);
G06F18/24137 (US);
G06F18/2431 (US);
G06T7/11 (US);
G06T7/136 (US);
G06T7/62 (EP,US);
G06T7/68 (EP,US);
G06V10/454 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20061 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20072 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20084 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSWERTUNG UND QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON NOTFALLFUNKTIONEN AUF EINER KOPFCOMPUTERTOMOGRAPHIE | [2018/43] | English: | INTERPRETATION AND QUANTIFICATION OF EMERGENCY FEATURES ON HEAD COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY | [2018/43] | French: | INTERPRÉTATION ET QUANTIFICATION DE CARACTÉRISTIQUE D'URGENCE SUR UNE TOMOGRAPHIE ASSISTÉE PAR ORDINATEUR DE TÊTE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 10.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.10.2023 | 24.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - ESTHER L. YUH ET AL, "Computer-Aided Assessment of Head Computed Tomography (CT) Studies in Patients with Suspected Traumatic Brain Injury", JOURNAL OF NEUROTRAUMA., US, (20081001), vol. 25, no. 10, doi:10.1089/neu.2008.0590, ISSN 0897-7151, pages 1163 - 1172, XP055597604 [X] 1,7-9,14-16 * abstract * * sections "Introduction", "Computer algorithm" * [Y] 2-6,11-13 [I] 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/neu.2008.0590 | [Y] - JONATHAN LONG ET AL, "Fully convolutional networks for semantic segmentation", 2015 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR), (20150601), vol. 39, no. 4, doi:10.1109/CVPR.2015.7298965, ISBN 978-1-4673-6964-0, pages 3431 - 3440, XP055573743 [Y] 2-6,13 * abstract * * sections 1, 3 * * figures 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2015.7298965 | [Y] - SHAOQING REN ET AL, "Faster R-CNN: Towards Real-Time Object Detection with Region Proposal Networks", ADVANCES IN NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEMS (NIPS 2015), (20151207), XP055488147 [Y] 2-6,13 * abstract * | [Y] - Bharath Hariharan ET AL, "Simultaneous Detection and Segmentation", Serious Games, Cham, Springer International Publishing, (20140101), vol. 8695, pages 297 - 312, 032682, doi:10.1007/978-3-319-10584-0_20, ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-540-37274-5, XP055598075 [Y] 2-6,13 * abstract * * section 1 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-10584-0_20 | [Y] - SHARMA BHAVNA ET AL, "Classification of hematomas in brain CT images using neural network", 2014 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ISSUES AND CHALLENGES IN INTELLIGENT COMPUTING TECHNIQUES (ICICT), IEEE, (20140207), doi:10.1109/ICICICT.2014.6781250, pages 41 - 46, XP032583686 [Y] 11-13 * abstract * * section III, introductory portion * * sections III.A, III.B. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICICICT.2014.6781250 | International search | [A]US2010145194 (JOSHI ABHINAY D [US], et al) [A] 1-14 and 20-23* , entire document *; | [Y]US2012114205 (TANG FUK HAY [HK], et al) [Y] 20-23 * , entire document, especially Abstract; Para [0011], [0025] *; | [A]US2012184840 (NAJARIAN KAYVAN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 and 20-23 * , entire document *; | [XY]US9165360 (BATES DOUGLAS [US], et al) [X] 1 and 14 * , entire document, especially Abstract; Fig. 4A, 4B, 13C; col 15, In 40 to col 16, In 5; col 28, In 10-25 * [Y] 2-14, 20-23; | [Y]US2015324690 (CHILIMBI TRISHUL A [US], et al) [Y] 13-14 * , entire document, especially Abstract; Para [0007]-[0008], [0048], [0063] *; | [Y] - PLASSARD et al., "Revealing Latent Value of Clinically Acquired CTs of Traumatic Brain Injury Through Multi-Atlas Segmentation in a Retrospective Study of 1,003 with External Cross- Validation", Proc SPIE Int Soc Opt Eng., (20150320), URL: URL:https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/25914504, (20170217), XP060051112 [Y] 2-14 and 23 * , entire document, especially Abstract; page 3, 5-6 and 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2081329 | [Y] - SUZUKI, "Pixel-Based Machine Learning in Medical Imaging", International Journal of Biomedical Imaging, (20111114), URL: https://www.hindawi.com/journals/ijbi/2012/792079, (20170217), XP055263162 [Y] 3-14 and 23 * , entire document, especially Abstract; page 2 and 5-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2012/792079 | by applicant | - ESTHER L. YUH et al., "Computer-Aided Assessment of Head Computed Tomography (CT) Studies in Patients with Suspected Traumatic Brain Injury", JOURNAL OF NEUROTRAUMA., vol. 25, no. 10, doi:10.1089/neu.2008.0590, ISSN ISSN 0897-7151, (20081001), pages 1163 - 1172, URL: doi:10.1089/neu.2008.0590, XP055597604 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/neu.2008.0590 | - JONATHAN LONG et al., "Fully convolutional networks for semantic segmentation", IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, vol. 39, no. 4, doi:10.1109/CVPR.2015.7298965, ISBN ISBN 978-1-4673-6964-0, (20150601), pages 3431 - 3440, URL: doi:10.1109/CVPR.2015.7298965, XP055573743 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2015.7298965 | - "Simultaneous Detection and Segmentation", BHARATH HARIHARAN et al., Serious Games, Cham, Springer International Publishing, (20140101), vol. 8695, pages 297 - 312 |