EP3393643 - STATIC MIXERS FOR CONTINUOUS FLOW CATALYTIC REACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Clunies Ross Street Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | [2024/05] |
Former [2018/44] | For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Clunies Ross Street Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENRY, William C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton, Victoria 3168 / AU | 02 /
TSANAKTSIDIS, John C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton, Victoria 3168 / AU | 03 /
HORNUNG, Christian C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton, Victoria 3168 / AU | 04 /
URBAN, Andrew Joseph C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton, Victoria 3168 / AU | 05 /
FRASER, Darren C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton, Victoria 3168 / AU | 06 /
GUNASEGARAM, Dayalan Romesh C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton, Victoria 3168 / AU | 07 /
HORNE, Michael David C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton, Victoria 3168 / AU | 08 /
VEDER, Jean-Pierre C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton, Victoria 3168 / AU | 09 /
RODOPOULOS, Theo C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton, Victoria 3168 / AU | [2024/02] |
Former [2018/44] | 01 /
HENRY, William C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | ||
02 /
TSANAKTSIDIS, John C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | |||
03 /
HORNUNG, Christian C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | |||
04 /
URBAN, Andrew Joseph C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | |||
05 /
FRASER, Darren C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | |||
06 /
GUNASEGARAM, Dayalan Romesh C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | |||
07 /
HORNE, Michael David C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | |||
08 /
VEDER, Jean-Pierre C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | |||
09 /
RODOPOULOS, Theo C/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Research Way Clayton Victoria 3168 / AU | Representative(s) | Croston, David Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/05] |
Former [2018/44] | Croston, David Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16877005.5 | 21.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016AU51267 | Priority number, date | AU20150905354 | 23.12.2015 Original published format: AU 2015905354 | AU20160903998 | 03.10.2016 Original published format: AU 2016903998 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017106916 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393643 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3393643 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B05B13/00, B05B7/00, B01J19/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B05B13/0207 (EP,AU,US);
B01J23/755 (AU,KR,US);
B01J8/06 (AU,KR,US);
B01F25/3141 (AU);
B01F25/43141 (AU);
B05B13/0228 (EP,AU,US);
B05B7/1486 (EP,AU,US);
B29C64/153 (US);
C23C24/04 (EP,AU,US);
B01F2101/2204 (AU);
B01J2208/00831 (AU,KR,US);
B01J2208/00884 (AU,KR,US);
B01J2208/024 (AU,KR,US);
B01J2208/06 (AU,KR,US);
B01J2219/00033 (KR);
C07C209/36 (AU);
C07C29/175 (AU);
C07C45/65 (AU);
C07C51/36 (AU)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/36, C07C211/45 (AU);
C07C29/175, C07C33/20 (AU);
C07C45/65, C07C49/78 (AU);
C07C51/36, C07C53/126 (AU) |
Former IPC [2018/44] | B01F5/06, B01J19/24, B01F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STATISCHE MISCHER FÜR KATALYTISCHE REAKTOREN MIT KONTINUIERLICHEM FLUSS | [2018/44] | English: | STATIC MIXERS FOR CONTINUOUS FLOW CATALYTIC REACTORS | [2018/44] | French: | MÉLANGEURS STATIQUES POUR RÉACTEURS CATALYTIQUES À FLUX CONTINU | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 23.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 31.01.2024 | |
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
LV | 31.01.2024 | ||
PL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
PT | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 31.01.2024 | |
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4400309 (MCMAHON JOSEPH F [US], et al); | [X]US5071634 (MAUNULA TEUVO [FI], et al); | [X]EP0894523 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]US2007017633 (TONKOVICH ANNA L [US], et al); | [X]US2007237692 (BURD STEVEN W [US]); | [A]US7887764 (JERNBERG GARY R [US]); | [X]US8119554 (KASHANI-SHIRAZI NAWID [DE], et al); | [X]US2014072481 (SCAHILL JOHN [US]); | by applicant | US2014072481 |