EP3396358 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2024/20] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2018/44] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARUBE, Mikihiko c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 7-3, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16878176.3 | 09.11.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016JP83190 | Priority number, date | JP20150254975 | 25.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015254975 | [2018/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017110278 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3396358 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3396358 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88, G06T7/00 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G06T7/0004 (EP,US);
G01N21/8851 (US);
G01N21/88 (EP,US);
G06T7/001 (US);
G01N2021/8883 (US);
G06T2207/30132 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30184 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | G01N21/88 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/44] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | [2018/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2018 | Translation filed | 14.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 14.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2008291440 (HOKKAIDO ELECTRIC POWER, et al) [Y] 1-16 * [0034, 0037, 0039,0040] [0054] *; | [Y]JP2015138467 (FACTO STANDARD LLC DE) [Y] 1-16* [0019, 0044, 0049] [0070] *; | [Y] - R.S. ADHIKARI ET AL, "Image-based retrieval of concrete crack properties for bridge inspection", AUTOMATION IN CONSTRUCTION, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140401), vol. 39, doi:10.1016/j.autcon.2013.06.011, ISSN 0926-5805, pages 180 - 194, XP055308376 [Y] 1-16 * Section 3.3, 2nd paragraph. Section 3.3.1. p. 187, Table 3. Section 3.3.2. Section 3.3.3. reference [10]. Sections 3.1, 3.2 and Fig. 4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.autcon.2013.06.011 | International search | [Y]JPH01182714 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al) [Y] 10, 15 * , page 3, lower right column (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH01322069 (SHINTO PAINT CO LTD) [Y] 1, 4, 7, 9-16 * , page 3, upper right column to lower right column (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2000028541 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND, et al) [Y] 9-10, 15 * , paragraphs [0047] to [0054]; fig. 7 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2002257744 (TAKENAKA KOMUTEN CO) [A] 1-16* , (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2003035528 (OHBAYASHI CORP) [Y] 1, 4, 7, 9-16 * , paragraphs [0007], [0021], [0062], [0065] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005062041 (IZUMO JUNICHI, et al) [Y] 1, 4, 7, 9-16 * , paragraphs [0008], [0066] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005180164 (YAGI CORP KK) [Y] 1, 4, 7, 9-16 * , paragraphs [0030], [0053] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010121992 (TAISEI CORP) [Y] 15 * , paragraph [0072] (Family: none) * |