EP3396761 - FUEL CELL SYSTEM AND FUEL CELL SYSTEM CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIOMI, Takeshi c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2020/32] |
Former [2018/44] | 01 /
SHIOMI, Takeshi c/o Intellectual Property Department of NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD. 1-1 Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16878268.8 | 28.11.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016JP85171 | Priority number, date | JP20150253852 | 25.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015253852 | [2018/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017110374 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3396761 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3396761 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/0612, H01M8/04014, H01M8/0432, H01M8/04537, H01M8/04746, H01M8/043 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
H01M8/04022 (EP,US);
H01M8/0494 (US);
H01M8/043 (EP,US);
H01M8/04302 (US);
H01M8/04328 (EP,US);
H01M8/04343 (US);
H01M8/04559 (EP,US);
H01M8/04753 (EP,US);
H01M8/04776 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | H01M8/04, H01M8/10, H01M8/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM UND BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEMSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/44] | English: | FUEL CELL SYSTEM AND FUEL CELL SYSTEM CONTROL METHOD | [2018/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2018 | Translation filed | 24.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 24.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2016 | AL | 05.08.2020 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | ES | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | IT | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | NL | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | TR | 05.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IE | 28.11.2020 | LU | 28.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 28.11.2016 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MK | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.11.2016 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002068204 (IIO MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,13,14 * paragraphs [0028] - [0057]; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2005112419 (ZHENG RONG [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,13,14 * paragraphs [0028] , [0051] , [0057] , [0061] , [0063]; claim 14 * [Y] 9,11; | [A]US2005186454 (CLINGERMAN BRUCE J [US], et al) [A] 7* paragraphs [0035] - [0037] *; | [IAY]US2006003205 (YOSHIDA NAOHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-8,13,14 * paragraphs [0053] - [0070] * [A] 12 [Y] 9-11; | [Y]US2012028144 (TANAKA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0142] *; | [X]US2015255808 (NAKAMURA KAZUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,13,14 * paragraphs [0074] - [0076] - [0 78] - [0083] - [0 91] - [0093] *; | [X]DE102015005978 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,13,14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0017] , [0021] *; | [E]EP3396760 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [E] 1,3,5,7,8,13,14 * figures 3A,3B; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2002198081 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 3-8, 13 * , paragraphs [0017], [0023], [0049] & US 2002/0078628 A1 paragraphs [0033], [0041], [0079] *; | [A]JP2012230807 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-14* , paragraph [0055] (Family: none) *; | [XYA]WO2012176528 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [X] 1, 2, 14 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0053] & EP 2725647 A1 paragraphs [0012] to [0051] & US 2014/0120439 A1 & CA 2839656 A & CN 103597644 A * [Y] 3-8, 13 [A] 9-12; | [A]JP2013101774 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-14 * , paragraph [0039] (Family: none) * |