EP3396002 - STEEL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/27] |
Former [2018/44] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERAMOTO Shinya c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
SHIGA Akira c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
HASEGAWA Hajime c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 04 /
MIZUKAMI Hideo c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16878797.6 | 21.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016JP88183 | Priority number, date | JP20150253562 | 25.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015253562 | [2018/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017110910 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3396002 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/60, C21D8/00, F16C7/02, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/28 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
C22C38/60 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/24 (EP,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,US);
C21D2211/005 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | C22C38/60, C21D8/00, F16C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Title | German: | STAHLBAUTEIL | [2018/44] | English: | STEEL COMPONENT | [2018/44] | French: | COMPOSANT EN ACIER | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2018 | Translation filed | 21.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 22.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0856590 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 1-3 *; | [X]JP2000160286 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]JP2003055714 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 1-5 *; | [A]JP2003055715 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0010] *; | [X]JP2005002367 (SANYO SPECIAL STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]JP2006052432 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [A]EP2000553 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 1,3,4 * | International search | [A]JP2000073141 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-5 * , claims (Family: none *; | [A]WO2007108365 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * , claims & US 2009/0047169 A1 claims & EP 2000553 A1 & CN 101405418 A & JP 2007-277705 A *; | [A]JP2008274393 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , claims (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2009107282 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * , claims & US 2010/0143180 A1 claims & EP 2246451 A1 & CN 101652493 A & JP 5251872 B2 *; | [A]JP2010053391 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-5* , claims (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2014178099 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * , claims & US 2015/0218685 A1 claims & CN 104254626 A & JP 5522321 B1 * |