EP3395976 - GRAIN-ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO Co., Ltd 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | For all designated states POSCO Co., Ltd 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu, Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | ||
Former [2022/47] | For all designated states POSCO Holdings Inc. 440, Teheran-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06194 / KR | ||
Former [2018/44] | For all designated states Posco (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOO, Hyung Don c/o POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Hyung Ki c/o POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 03 /
SEO, Jin Wook c/o POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Sang Woo c/o POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16879376.8 | 22.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016KR15119 | Priority number, date | KR20150183796 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: KR 20150183796 | [2018/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017111509 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3395976 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/06, C22C38/04, C22C38/34, C22C38/60, C21D8/12, C21D9/46 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
C21D8/1272 (EP,US);
C21D8/1205 (EP,US);
C21D8/1244 (EP,US);
C21D8/1283 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/004 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/008 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/34 (EP,US);
C22C38/60 (EP,US);
C21D2201/05 (EP,US);
C21D8/1222 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | C22C38/02, C22C38/06, C22C38/00, C22C38/04, C22C38/18, C21D8/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Title | German: | KORNORIENTIERTES ELEKTRISCHES STAHLBLECH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/44] | English: | GRAIN-ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2018/44] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER MAGNÉTIQUE À GRAINS ORIENTÉS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION S'Y RAPPORTANT | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2018 | Translation filed | 22.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 22.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1136018 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1179603 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-13 * * tables 1-25 *; | [Y]JP2003193133 (JFE STEEL KK) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]KR100721822B (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2096185 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-9 * * paragraphs [0087] - [0101] *; | [A]CN103525999 (REN ZHENZHOU) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20140127648 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]EP2940170 (POSCO [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-11 * * paragraphs [0030] - [0069] * * table 1 * | International search | [A]JPH10324959 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-29 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0040] and claims 1, 5. *; | [A]JP2000204450 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-29* See paragraphs [0038]-[0040] and claim 1. *; | [A]JP2004353036 (JFE STEEL KK) [A] 1-29 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0037] and claims 1, 6. *; | [A]KR20090049611 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-29 * See paragraphs [0063]-[0073] and claims 1,5. *; | [A]KR20150073551 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-29 * See paragraphs [0047]-[0054], [0069]-[0087] and claims 1, 2, 6, 11, 14. * |