EP3394262 - ANTISENSE ANTIBACTERIAL COMPOUNDS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oregon State University 220 Nash Hall Corvallis OR 97331-3804 / US | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 210 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENBERG, David 408 Pecan Hollow Drive Coppell, TX 75019 / US | 02 /
GELLER, Bruce L. 6994 N.W. Concord Drive Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2024/35] |
Former [2018/44] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16880107.4 | 22.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016US68376 | Priority number, date | US201562387178P | 23.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562387178 P | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017112888 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3394262 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3394262 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61P31/04, A61K31/712 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K31/7115 (EP,US);
A61K31/712 (EP,US);
A61K47/42 (US);
A61K47/66 (US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3233 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | C12N15/113 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIBAKTERIELLE ANTISENSE-VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2018/44] | English: | ANTISENSE ANTIBACTERIAL COMPOUNDS AND METHODS | [2018/44] | French: | COMPOSÉS ANTIBACTÉRIENS ANTISENS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 23.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.06.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007009094 (AVI BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al); | [XI]WO2015179249 (GELLER BRUCE L [US], et al); | [XI]US2015361425 (GELLER BRUCE L [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2013288369 (IVERSEN PATRICK L [US]); | [A]US2015141321 (KOLE RYSZARD [US], et al); | [X]US2015361425 (GELLER BRUCE L [US], et al) | by applicant | US5034506 | US5142047 | US5166315 | WO9301286 | US5185444 | US5217866 | US5506337 | US5521063 | US5698685 | US6245747 | WO2004097017 | US6965025 | US6969400 | WO2007009094 | WO2009005793 | WO2009064471 | US2010016215 | US8076476 | WO2012043730 | US8299206 | WO2012150960 | WO2015179249 |