EP3399044 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HEPARAN SULFATE HAVING ANTICOAGULANT ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOKURA, Yuriko c/o Ajinomoto Co. Inc. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2018/45] | Application number, filing date | 16881650.2 | 16.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016JP87688 | Priority number, date | JP20150256988 | 28.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015256988 | [2018/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017115674 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3399044 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3399044 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/04, C08B37/10, A61K31/727, A61P7/02, C12N9/14, C12N15/09, C12P19/26 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
C12P19/04 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP,US);
C12P19/26 (EP,US);
A61K31/727 (EP,US);
C12N15/09 (EP,US);
C12N9/14 (EP,US);
C12Y402/02008 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | C12P19/04, C08B37/10, A61K31/727, A61P7/02, C12N9/14, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HEPARANSULFAT MIT ANTIKOAGULIERENDER WIRKUNG | [2018/45] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HEPARAN SULFATE HAVING ANTICOAGULANT ACTIVITY | [2018/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE SULFATE D'HÉPARANE À ACTIVITÉ ANTICOAGULANTE | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2018 | Translation filed | 28.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 28.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.02.2021 | AT | 03.02.2021 | CY | 03.02.2021 | DK | 03.02.2021 | EE | 03.02.2021 | FI | 03.02.2021 | HR | 03.02.2021 | LT | 03.02.2021 | LV | 03.02.2021 | MC | 03.02.2021 | MK | 03.02.2021 | MT | 03.02.2021 | PL | 03.02.2021 | RO | 03.02.2021 | RS | 03.02.2021 | SE | 03.02.2021 | SI | 03.02.2021 | SK | 03.02.2021 | SM | 03.02.2021 | TR | 03.02.2021 | NO | 03.05.2021 | GR | 04.05.2021 | IS | 03.06.2021 | PT | 04.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
MK | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
TR | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
MK | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008032349 (VISKOV CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] *; | [Y]WO2012116048 (RENSSELAER POLYTECH INST [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, lines 14-20; figure -; claim - *; | [YP]EP3054005 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [YP] 1-13 * paragraph [0261]; claim - *; | [Y] - WU JINGJUN ET AL, "Controllable production of low molecular weight heparins by combinations of heparinase I/II/III", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, (20130923), vol. 101, doi:10.1016/J.CARBPOL.2013.09.052, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 484 - 492, XP028790571 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2013.09.052 | International search | [Y]WO2004050673 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * , claims; example 19 & US 2008/0207895 A1 claims; example 19 *; | [A]JP2007501305 (Inalco S.p.A.) [A] 1-13 * , claims & US 2007/0042993 A1 & WO 2005/014656 A1 & EP 1654288 A & KR 10-2006-0063933 A & CN 1832966 A *; | [A]JP2007517771 (Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) [A] 1-13* , & US 2005/0207988 A1 & WO 2005/032483 A2 & EP 1667633 A *; | [Y]JP2008512105 (Aventis Pharma S.A.) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0005] to [0007] & US 2008/0032349 A1 paragraphs [0005], [0006] & WO 2006/030099 A1 & EP 1791947 A *; | [Y]WO2015050184 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0260] to [0272] & US 2016/0201103 A1 paragraphs [0386] to [0398] & EP 3054005 A1 *; | [Y] - CHAI, WENGANG et al., "Relative Susceptibilities of the Glucosamine-Glucuronic Acid and N-Acetylglucosamine-Glucuronic Acid Linkages to Heparin Lyase III", Biochemistry, (20040000), vol. 43, no. 26, pages 8590 - 8599, XP055396250 [Y] 1-13 * ABSTRACT, MATERIALS AND METHODS * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi036250k |