EP3398812 - SCANNING HEADLIGHT AND CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR SCANNING HEAD LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/27] |
Former [2018/45] | For all designated states Ortus Technology Co., Ltd. 2-8-7 Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAIKU Yasuhiro c/o ORTUS TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD. 2-8-7 Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House (2nd Floor) Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16881699.9 | 22.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016JP88426 | Priority number, date | JP20150256474 | 28.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015256474 | [2018/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017115724 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3398812 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, B60Q1/02, B60Q1/08, F21S41/16, F21S41/14, G06K9/00, G06K9/20 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
B60Q1/085 (EP,US);
F21S41/125 (EP,US);
F21S41/16 (EP,US);
F21S41/675 (EP,US);
G06V10/145 (EP,US);
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/054 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/056 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/45 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | B60Q1/00, B60Q1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Title | German: | ABTASTSCHEINWERFER UND VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM FÜR ABTASTSCHEINWERFER | [2018/45] | English: | SCANNING HEADLIGHT AND CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR SCANNING HEAD LIGHT | [2018/45] | French: | PHARE À BALAYAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET PROGRAMME POUR PHARE À BALAYAGE | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2018 | Translation filed | 15.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 01.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/42] | 17.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE202013006071U (KAUT STEPHAN [DE]) [X] 1,5-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0006] - [0008] - [0011]; figures 1,2; claims 1-8 * [A] 2-4; | [X]WO2015115083 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-5; claims 1-12 *; | [XP]DE102015200748 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [XP] 1,6-8* paragraphs [0007] , [0012] , [0013] , [0024] - [0029] - [0051] - [0054] - [0074] , [0076] , [0078]; figures 1-5; claims 1-9 *; | [P]EP3100908 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0022] - [0031] - [0034] - [0038]; figures 1-5; claims 1-12 *; | [E]DE102015115239 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [E] 1,5-8 * paragraphs [0012] - [0020] - [0025] , [0027] , [0042] - [0045] - [0051] , [0057]; figures 1,2; claims 1-10 * | International search | [Y]JPH11208367 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 5 * , paragraphs [0036] to [0072], [0098]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2008143510 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [Y] 5 * , paragraphs [0029] to [0030], [0079] & US 2008/0175012 A1 paragraphs [0040] to [0041], [0099] *; | [Y]JP2010036835 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [Y] 2-4 * , paragraphs [0006] to [0029]; fig. 4 to 8 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012183863 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-8* , paragraphs [0015] to [0060]; fig. 1 to 8 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013184614 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 4 * , paragraphs [0033], [0049], [0066] to [0078]; fig. 1 to 2, 7 to 8 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2015155270 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [X] 1, 6-8 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0038]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-5 |