EP3364690 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/34] | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD OF MOBILE TERMINAL | ||
[2020/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Hee Kyung 116 Central park-ro 127beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16506 / KR | 02 /
OH, Hyun Cheol 30 Sinwon-ro 136beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16679 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Ji-Hyouk 232 Yeongtong-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16698 / KR | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2018/34] | Application number, filing date | 16881986.0 | 08.12.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016KR14374 | Priority number, date | KR20150187065 | 28.12.2015 Original published format: KR 20150187065 | [2018/34] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017116034 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3364690 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3364690 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/14, H04W48/16, H04W60/00, H04W12/06, H04W84/12 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
H04W48/14 (EP,US);
H04W12/062 (US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN DER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/24] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2020/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/24] |
Former [2018/34] | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN DER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN EINES MOBILEN ENDGERÄTS | ||
Former [2018/34] | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD OF MOBILE TERMINAL | ||
Former [2018/34] | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION DE TERMINAL MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2018 | Translation filed | 16.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 16.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2016 | AL | 02.09.2020 | AT | 02.09.2020 | CY | 02.09.2020 | CZ | 02.09.2020 | DK | 02.09.2020 | EE | 02.09.2020 | ES | 02.09.2020 | FI | 02.09.2020 | HR | 02.09.2020 | IT | 02.09.2020 | LT | 02.09.2020 | LV | 02.09.2020 | MC | 02.09.2020 | MK | 02.09.2020 | MT | 02.09.2020 | PL | 02.09.2020 | RO | 02.09.2020 | RS | 02.09.2020 | SE | 02.09.2020 | SI | 02.09.2020 | SK | 02.09.2020 | SM | 02.09.2020 | TR | 02.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BG | 02.12.2020 | NO | 02.12.2020 | GR | 03.12.2020 | IE | 08.12.2020 | LU | 08.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | IS | 02.01.2021 | PT | 04.01.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/34] | HU | 08.12.2016 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
MT | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
TR | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
BE | 31.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/32] | HU | 08.12.2016 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
MT | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
TR | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.12.2016 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MT | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
TR | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
IT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013046881 (SEELMAN GEORGE [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0141] *; | [Y]US2013173811 (HA CHANG HO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-9* paragraphs [0045] - [0096] *; | [Y]WO2015119394 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [Y]US2015264650 (SEKINE HIROSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0060] *; | US2016373270 [ ] (YANG HEE KYUNG [KR], et al) | International search | [A]KR20130013238 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0222]-[0247]; and figure 10. *; | [A]KR20130080487 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0061]-[0068]; and figure 4. *; | [A]WO2014178605 (INTELLECTUAL DISCOVERY CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [86]-[91]; and figure 8. *; | [Y]WO2015093906 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [40], [52], [71]-[72]; and figures 2, 5. *; | [Y]WO2015119394 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [67], [77]-[79]; claims 1, 13, 15, 18; and figure 2. * |