EP3397819 - A SHEET FOR USE AS A WEATHER RESISTANT BARRIER AND A BUILDING ASSEMBLY INCLUDING THE SHEET AS A WEATHER RESISTANT BARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/45] | BUILDING ASSEMBLY INCLUDING A WEATHER RESISTANT BARRIER, A SHEET FOR USE AS A WEATHER RESISTANT BARRIER, A LIQUID COATING COMPOSITION AND METHODS OF MAKING THE FOREGOING | ||
[2021/48] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CertainTeed Corporation 20 Moores Road Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEET, Jeffrey H. 9 Atwood Rd. Southborough Massachusetts 01772 / US | 02 /
HEURTEFEU, Bertrand 45 rue de Flandre 93290 Tremblay-en-France / FR | 03 /
LOVE, Nicole 92 Powder House Blvd. Unit 2 Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | 04 /
DIGUET, Antoine 10 rue de Rochechouart 75009 Paris / FR | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2018/45] | Application number, filing date | 16882576.8 | 28.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016US68920 | Priority number, date | US201562273639P | 31.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562273639 P | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017117244 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3397819 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09D109/02, C09D133/26, E04B1/62, C09D109/06, E04C2/04, E04C2/52 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
E04B1/625 (EP,US);
E04B1/64 (KR);
B05D1/02 (US);
B05D1/18 (US);
B05D1/28 (US);
C08L1/08 (KR);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C08L23/36 (KR);
C08L33/26 (KR);
C09D109/00 (US);
C09D109/02 (EP,US);
C09D109/06 (EP,US);
C09D133/08 (US);
C09D133/26 (EP,US);
E04C2/043 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D133/26, C08L33/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | E04B1/64, C08L33/26, C08L23/36, C08L1/08, C08L101/00, E04B1/62, C09D109/00, C09D109/06, C09D133/08, E04C2/04, E04C2/52 | ||
Former IPC [2018/45] | E04B1/64, C08L33/26, C08L23/36, C08L1/08, C08L101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Title | German: | FOLIE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS WETTERBESTÄNDIGE BARRIERE UND GEBÄUDEANORDNUNG MIT DIESER FOLIE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS WETTERBESTÄNDIGE BARRIERE | [2021/48] | English: | A SHEET FOR USE AS A WEATHER RESISTANT BARRIER AND A BUILDING ASSEMBLY INCLUDING THE SHEET AS A WEATHER RESISTANT BARRIER | [2021/48] | French: | FEUILLE UTILISÉE COMME UNE BARRIÈRE RÉSISTANT AUX INTEMPÉRIES ET ENSEMBLE DE BÂTIMENT COMPRENANT CETTE FEUILLE UTILISÉE COMME UNE BARRIÈRE RÉSISTANT AUX INTEMPÉRIES | [2021/48] |
Former [2018/45] | GEBÄUDEANORDNUNG MIT EINER WETTERBESTÄNDIGEN BARRIERE, EINER FOLIE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS WETTERBESTÄNDIGE BARRIERE, EINER FLÜSSIGEN BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2018/45] | BUILDING ASSEMBLY INCLUDING A WEATHER RESISTANT BARRIER, A SHEET FOR USE AS A WEATHER RESISTANT BARRIER, A LIQUID COATING COMPOSITION AND METHODS OF MAKING THE FOREGOING | ||
Former [2018/45] | ENSEMBLE DE BÂTIMENT COMPRENANT UNE BARRIÈRE RÉSISTANT AUX INTEMPÉRIES, FEUILLE UTILISÉE COMME UNE BARRIÈRE RÉSISTANT AUX INTEMPÉRIES, COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT LIQUIDE ET DES PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE CES DERNIERS | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 14.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/36] | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2015176211 (KNAPP KENNETH D [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043]; figure 1A * [Y] 2-9; | [XY]WO2015095786 (CERTAIN TEED CORP [US]) [X] 1,7,10,11 * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 2, line 2 - line 9 * * page 9, line 20 - line 25 * * page 10, line 22 - line 28 * * page 11, line 16 - line 23 * * page 12, line 13 - page 13, line 16 * [Y] 2-6,8,9; | [XY]US2009139181 (BOWE MICHAEL DAMIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0019] * [Y] 2-9; | [IY]US2006128241 (TSENG SHENG-MAO [TW]) [I] 12-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0073]; claim 1 * [Y] 2-6,8,9; | [A]US2007294976 (FAY RALPH MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0029] *; | [A]WO2012140059 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US7662221 (FAY RALPH MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1-15 * See column 3, lines 34-53, column 5, lines 25-53, claims 1-3, and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2006128241 (TSENG SHENG-MAO [TW]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraph [0068] and claims 1-3, 5-6, 18. *; | [A]US2009107080 (BOWE MICHAEL DAMIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract and claims 1-5. *; | [A]US6686046 (SCHAUER THADEUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract and column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 41. *; | [A]WO2012140064 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract and claims 1-3. * | by applicant | US2015176211 | WO2015095786 | US2009139181 | US2006128241 | DE102006043672 |