EP3397586 - MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES FOR OPTICALLY-DRIVEN CONVECTION AND DISPLACEMENT, KITS AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berkeley Lights, Inc. 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURZ, Volker L.S. 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 02 /
LIONBERGER, Troy A. 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 03 /
SACKMANN, Eric K. 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 04 /
SZETO, Kai W. 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 05 /
LEBEL, Paul M. 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 06 /
BRUHN, Brandon R. 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 07 /
BREINLINGER, Keith J. 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 08 /
HOBBS, Eric D. 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 09 /
MCFARLAND, Andrew W. 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 10 /
NEVILL, J., Tanner 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 11 /
WANG, Xiaohua 5858 Horton Street Suite 320 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16882668.3 | 29.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016US69249 | Priority number, date | US201562273104P | 30.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562273104 P | US201662314889P | 29.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662314889 P | US201662428539P | 01.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662428539 P | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017117408 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3397586 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B81B7/02, G01N35/08, C12M3/06, C12M1/26, B01L3/00, C12M1/00 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
B01L3/502761 (EP,IL,US);
C12M23/16 (IL,US);
B81B7/02 (KR);
C12M23/20 (IL,US);
C12M33/12 (IL,US);
G01N35/08 (KR);
B01L2200/0668 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2300/1822 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2400/0415 (IL,US);
B01L2400/0427 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2400/0442 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2400/0454 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2400/086 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | B81B7/02, G01N35/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR OPTISCH GESTEUERTE KONVEKTION UND VERDRÄNGUNG, KITS UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/45] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES FOR OPTICALLY-DRIVEN CONVECTION AND DISPLACEMENT, KITS AND METHODS THEREOF | [2018/45] | French: | DISPOSITIFS MICROFLUIDIQUES POUR CONVECTION ET DÉPLACEMENT À COMMANDE OPTIQUE, KITS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 09.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006177350 (SANO TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-12,14,17-19 * paragraphs [0071] - [0087] - [ 140] - [0150]; figure 5; claims 1-5 * [I] 8,13,15,16; | [A]US2007292312 (BACHMAN MARK [US], et al) [A] 15* paragraph [0141]; figures 24B-D *; | [XI]US2014116881 (CHAPMAN KEVIN T [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9-12,17-19 * paragraphs [0111] - [0114] - [0 48] , [0 53] - [0077]; figures 2-7, 17 * [I] 8,13,16; | [XI]US2015151298 (HOBBS ERIC D [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9-12,17,19 * paragraphs [0064] - [0100] - [ 105] - [0110] - [ 131] , [ 138] , [ 144] - [0147] - [ 191]; figures 3A-B, 4B-C, 6, 9-12 * [I] 2,8,13,16; | [XI]US2015165436 (CHAPMAN KEVIN T [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9-12,17-19 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 61] , [0 67] - [0069] - [0 80] - [0090] - [ 100] - [0101]; figures 1-7, 10, 11A; claims 1-7 * [I] 8,13,16 | International search | [Y]US2004086870 (TYVOLL DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 9-10, 26 * ; figure 9; paragraph [0069], [0135] *; | [Y]US2009021728 (HEINZ ROBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 32-33, 48/1* ; paragraph [0101], [0218], [0293] *; | [XY]US2010173393 (HANDIQUE KALYAN [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 11-25, 27-29 * ; figures 2B, 10A-10B, 11, 12A-12C; paragraphs [0065], [0073], [0093], [0100]-[0104], [0138]; claims 18, 27-28 * [Y] 7-10, 26, 30-33, 48/1; | [Y]US2014116881 (CHAPMAN KEVIN T [US], et al) [Y] 30-31 * ; paragraphs [0005], [0044] *; | [Y]WO2015061497 (BERKELEY LIGHTS INC [US], et al) [Y] 7-10 * ; paragraphs [00124]-[00125]; figure 7A * | by applicant | US2006177350 | US2014116881 | US2015151298 | US2015165436 |