EP3296417 - MICROALLOYED STEEL FOR CAR CARBON WHEEL HUB BEARING AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangyin Xingcheng Special Steel Works Co., Ltd Liao Shuquan 297 East Binjiang Road Jiangyin, Jiangsu Jiangyin, Jiangsu 214429 / CN | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Min Liao Shuquan No. 297 East Binjiang Road Jiangyin Jiangsu 214429 / CN | 02 /
LI, Feng Liao Shuquan No. 297 East Binjiang Road Jiangyin Jiangsu 214429 / CN | 03 /
YIN, Qing Liao Shuquan No. 297 East Binjiang Road Jiangyin Jiangsu 214429 / CN | 04 /
ZHAI, Jiaolong Liao Shuquan No. 297 East Binjiang Road Jiangyin Jiangsu 214429 / CN | 05 /
GENG, Ke Liao Shuquan No. 297 East Binjiang Road Jiangyin Jiangsu 214429 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Jianfeng Liao Shuquan No. 297 East Binjiang Road Jiangyin Jiangsu 214429 / CN | 07 /
HUANG, Zhen Liao Shuquan No. 297 East Binjiang Road Jiangyin Jiangsu 214429 / CN | 08 /
BAO, Jian Liao Shuquan No. 297 East Binjiang Road Jiangyin Jiangsu 214429 / CN | 09 /
RUAN, Xiaojiang Liao Shuquan No. 297 East Binjiang Road Jiangyin Jiangsu 214429 / CN | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Huang, Liwei Cäcilienstraße 12 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Hryszkiewicz, Danuta Matthias Scholl, Inc. Friedrichstrasse 123 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 16883027.1 | 12.04.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016CN79010 | Priority number, date | CN20161001624 | 05.01.2016 Original published format: CN201610001624 | [2018/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017117883 | Date: | 13.07.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3296417 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/02, C22C38/04, B22D11/00, B22D11/115, B22D11/12, B22D11/18, C21D6/00, C22C38/00, C21D8/06, C21D9/40, // C22C38/18, C22C38/20, C22C38/22, C22C38/40, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/50, C22C38/28, C22C38/06, C22C38/60 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
C21D9/40 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/60 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B21B1/22 (US);
B22D11/001 (EP,US);
B22D11/115 (EP,US);
B22D11/1206 (EP,US);
B22D11/1213 (EP,US);
B22D11/122 (EP,US);
B22D11/18 (EP,CN,US);
B22D11/225 (CN);
C21C5/54 (CN);
C21C7/06 (CN);
C21C7/10 (CN);
C21D6/004 (EP,KR,US);
C21D6/005 (EP,US);
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D8/065 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/008 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/08 (CN);
C22C38/12 (CN);
C22C38/16 (CN);
C22C38/18 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/20 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/40 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,KR,US);
B21B2001/225 (US);
B60B27/02 (US);
F16C19/186 (US);
F16C2204/72 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | C22C38/18, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/20, C22C38/22, C22C38/40, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/50, B22D11/00, B22D11/115, B22D11/12, B22D11/18, C22C38/28 | ||
Former IPC [2018/12] | C22C38/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Title | German: | MIKROLEGIERTER STAHL FÜR KOHLENSTOFFRADNABENLAGER EINES FAHRZEUGES UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/12] | English: | MICROALLOYED STEEL FOR CAR CARBON WHEEL HUB BEARING AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2018/12] | French: | ACIER MICRO-ALLIÉ POUR PALIER DE MOYEU DE ROUE DE VOITURE EN CARBONE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2017 | Translation filed | 08.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 08.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/13] | 23.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4671335 (AYATA KENZO [JP], et al) [A] 4 * abstract * * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 6 *; | [XA]US6372057 (FUJIMURA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * claims 1-2 * * column 5, line 1 - line 17 * [A] 3-5; | [A]US2005279431 (DAITO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [YA]CN101376948 (BAOSTEEL GROUP CORP [CN]) [Y] 4 * abstract * * column 4 - column 5 * [A] 1-3,5; | [YA]WO2013154129 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [Y] 4 * abstract * [A] 1-3,5; | [XY]CN104032224 (UNIV PEKING FOUNDER GROUP CO, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0070] * * claims 1-4,20,21 * [Y] 4; | [A]WO2014142597 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 4 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] *; | [XAY]US2014373978 (ISOBE KOHICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * claim - * [A] 2,3,5 [Y] 4; | [A] - Siebo Kunstreich, "MILLENNIUM STEEL 2014 Recent developments of electro- magnetic actuators for continuous casting of long and flat products", (20141231), URL: http://millennium-steel.com/wp-content/uploads/2014/05/pp64-69_ms14.pdf, (20180216), XP055452173 [A] 4 * the whole document * | [A] - 53, "The Triumph of Emptiness: Consumption, Higher Education, and Work Organization", Times Higher Education, (20131219), pages 53 - 8, URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1007/s11015-009-9209-1.pdf, (20090901), XP055452171 [A] 4 * the whole document * | International search | [X]CN1745188 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-5 * , claim 1 *; | [X]CN101376948 (BAOSTEEL GROUP CORP [CN]) [X] 1-5 * , abstract, claim 2, and description, page 6 *; | [X]WO2013084864 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5* , abstract * | by applicant | GB191510561 |