EP3404607 - INFORMATION DELIVERY METHOD AND APPARATUS, SERVER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2018/47] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Dapeng 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
XIAO, Lei 35/F Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/47] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16884809.1 | 30.12.2016 | [2018/47] | WO2016CN113842 | Priority number, date | CN20161017753 | 12.01.2016 Original published format: CN201610017753 | [2018/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017121258 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3404607 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0243 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0244 (CN,KR);
G06N7/01 (US);
G06Q30/0241 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0246 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0251 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSBEREITSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, SERVER UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2018/47] | English: | INFORMATION DELIVERY METHOD AND APPARATUS, SERVER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2018/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DISTRIBUTION D'INFORMATIONS, SERVEUR ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2018/47] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2017 | Translation filed | 13.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/47] | 13.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 09.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.10.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013339350 (WEI HUI [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0138] ** figure 4 *; | [I]WO2015127884 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0122] * |