EP3407119 - POLARIZED LENS FOR SPECTACLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Talex Optical Co., Ltd. 5-6, Tajima 4-chome Ikuno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 544-0011 / JP | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMURA Hiroo 5-33 Tajima 4-chome Ikuno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 544-0011 / JP | 02 /
MITSUUCHI Shoichi c/o Talex Optical Co. Ltd. 5-6 Tajima 4-chome Ikuno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 544-0011 / JP | 03 /
WADA Kenzo c/o Talex Optical Co. Ltd. 5-6 Tajima 4-chome Ikuno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 544-0011 / JP | 04 /
NITTA Ryogo c/o Talex Optical Co. Ltd. 5-6 Tajima 4-chome Ikuno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 544-0011 / JP | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 16886378.5 | 17.06.2016 | [2018/48] | WO2016JP68079 | Priority number, date | JP20160010521 | 22.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016010521 | [2018/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017126138 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3407119 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3407119 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/12, G02B5/22, G02B5/30, G02C7/10 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G02C7/108 (EP,US);
G02C7/12 (US);
G02B1/041 (US);
G02B5/22 (EP,US);
G02B5/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/48] | G02C7/12, G02B5/22, G02B5/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLARISIERTE LINSE FÜR BRILLEN | [2018/48] | English: | POLARIZED LENS FOR SPECTACLES | [2018/48] | French: | VERRE POLARISÉ POUR LUNETTES | [2018/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2018 | Translation filed | 22.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 29.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2016 | AL | 11.08.2021 | AT | 11.08.2021 | CY | 11.08.2021 | CZ | 11.08.2021 | DK | 11.08.2021 | EE | 11.08.2021 | ES | 11.08.2021 | FI | 11.08.2021 | HR | 11.08.2021 | LT | 11.08.2021 | LV | 11.08.2021 | MC | 11.08.2021 | MK | 11.08.2021 | NL | 11.08.2021 | PL | 11.08.2021 | RO | 11.08.2021 | RS | 11.08.2021 | SE | 11.08.2021 | SI | 11.08.2021 | SK | 11.08.2021 | SM | 11.08.2021 | TR | 11.08.2021 | BG | 11.11.2021 | NO | 11.11.2021 | GR | 12.11.2021 | IS | 11.12.2021 | PT | 13.12.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.06.2016 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 17.06.2016 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.06.2016 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4152332 (BLOOM STANLEY M [US]) [Y] 1-6 * column 8, line 28 - column 9, line 19; figure 5 *; | [XY]US5926310 (TAMURA KANICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * [Y] 1-6; | [A]US8210678 (FARWIG MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 10 - line 50; figure 9; claim 8 *; | [A]EP2618206 (TALEX OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract ** paragraph [0036] * | International search | [Y]JP3357803B (Talex Optical Co., Ltd.) [Y] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0037]; fig. 2 to 4 & US 5926310 A specification, column 4, line 48 to column 6, line 9 *; | [Y]JP2003279905 (HAYASHI SOTOO) [Y] 3, 5, 6 * , paragraph [0025] & US 2003/0179459 A1 paragraph [0044] *; | [Y]WO2008133008 (TALEX OPTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0007] & US 2010/0118263 A1 paragraphs [0002] to [0007] & EP 2138887 A1 & AU 2008245205 A & CN 101652700 A & KR 10-2010-0014582 A & TW 200912426 A *; | [Y]WO2013054656 (YAMAMOTO KOGAKU [JP]) [Y] 5, 6* , paragraphs [0003], [0006] & US 2014/0320985 A1 paragraphs [0003], [0006] & EP 2767863 A1 & CN 103842892 A & KR 10-2014-0072030 A *; | [Y]JP2015180942 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [Y] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0171], [0172] & US 2013/0155507 A1 paragraphs [0248], [0249] & WO 2012/020570 A1 & EP 2605059 A1 & CN 103052904 A & KR 10-2013-0057453 A & KR 10-2015-0043556 A * |