EP3343639 - SOLAR CELL WITH HIGH PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION EFFICIENCY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SOLAR CELL WITH HIGH PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION EFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2022/07] |
Former [2018/27] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIGAMI, Hiroshi c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL Co. Ltd. 13-1 Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0195 / JP | 02 /
WATABE, Takenori c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL Co. Ltd. 13-1 Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0195 / JP | 03 /
OHTSUKA, Hiroyuki c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL Co. Ltd. 13-1 Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0195 / JP | 04 /
MITTA, Ryo c/o Kashima Branch Advanced Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL Co. Ltd. 1 Towada Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16886817.2 | 07.11.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016JP04824 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018083722 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343639 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/068, H01L31/18, H01L31/0216, H01L31/0224 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
H01L31/0682 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/02167 (EP,US);
H01L31/02168 (KR,US);
H01L31/022441 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/036 (KR);
H01L31/1804 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/182 (US);
H01L31/1868 (KR);
Y02E10/52 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/27] | H01L31/0216, H01L31/068 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Title | German: | SOLARZELLE MIT HOHER PHOTOELEKTRISCHER UMWANDLUNGSEFFIZIENZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLARZELLE MIT HOHER PHOTOELEKTRISCHER UMWANDLUNGSEFFIZIENZ | [2018/27] | English: | SOLAR CELL WITH HIGH PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION EFFICIENCY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SOLAR CELL WITH HIGH PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION EFFICIENCY | [2018/27] | French: | CELLULE SOLAIRE À EFFICACITÉ DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE ÉLEVÉE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2017 | Translation filed | 01.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 22.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2016119346 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | International search | [X]JP2014072450 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JP2015507315 ; | [X]US2015068591 (CHAN KEVIN K [US], et al); | [X]WO2016051628 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | by applicant | JP2008010746 |