EP3320901 - DIMETHYLAMINOMICHELIOLIDE FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF PULMONARY FIBROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/20] | APPLICATION OF DIMETHYLAMINO MICHELIOLIDE | ||
[2019/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accendatech Room 927, Building C 5 Lanyuan St. Huayuan Industry Development Area Tianjin 300384 / CN | For all designated states Tianjin International Joint Academy of Biotechnology & Medicine 220 Dongting Road, TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2020/04] |
Former [2018/20] | For all designated states Tianjin International Joint Academy of Biotechnology & Medicine 220 Dongting Road, TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | ||
For all designated states Accendatech Room 927, Building C 5 Lanyuan St. Huayuan Industry Development Area Tianjin 300384 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Tao 220 Dongting Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Yue Room 927 Building C 5 Lanyuan St. Huayuan Industry Development Area Tianjin 300384 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Cheng 220 Dongting Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Honggang 220 Dongting Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Huijuan 220 Dongting Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Yanrong 220 Dongting Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 07 /
WANG, Jing 220 Dongting Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 08 /
ZHANG, Chengyu 220 Dongting Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 09 /
ZHANG, Qiang 220 Dongting Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 10 /
ZHANG, Xiangming 220 Dongting Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 11 /
QIN, Yuan 220 Dongting Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 12 /
JING, Xueshuang 220 Dongting Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16887050.9 | 28.01.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016CN72445 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017128163 | Date: | 03.08.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3320901 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3320901 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/365, A61P11/00, A61P43/00, A61K9/00 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/0073 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | A61K31/365, A61P1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIMETHYLAMINOMICHELIOLID ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LUNGENFIBROSE | [2019/43] | English: | DIMETHYLAMINOMICHELIOLIDE FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF PULMONARY FIBROSIS | [2019/43] | French: | DIMÉTHYLAMINOMICHELIOLIDE DESTINÉ AU TRAITEMENT DE LA FIBROSE PULMONAIRE | [2019/43] |
Former [2018/20] | ANWENDUNG VON DIMETHYLAMINO-MICHELIOLID | ||
Former [2018/20] | APPLICATION OF DIMETHYLAMINO MICHELIOLIDE | ||
Former [2018/20] | UTILISATION DE DIMÉTHYLAMINO MICHELIOLIDE | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2018 | Translation filed | 09.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 09.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | CY | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | LT | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | LV | 04.03.2020 | |
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | LV | 04.03.2020 | |
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | LV | 04.03.2020 | |
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | LV | 04.03.2020 | |
RS | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2562172 (ACCENDATECH [CN], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract ** claims 1-10 *; | [A] - YINGHONG AN ET AL, "Micheliolide Derivative DMAMCL Inhibits Glioma Cell Growth In Vitro and In Vivo", PLOS ONE, (20150206), vol. 10, no. 2, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0116202, page e0116202, XP055512656 [A] 1-5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0116202 | International search | [A]CN104876899 (ACCENDATECH CO LTD) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [E]CN105520933 (TIANJIN INT JOINT ACAD OF BIOMEDICINE, et al) [E] 1-5 * the whole document * |