EP3411574 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SELF-ADJUSTING ENGINE PERFORMANCE PARAMETERS DURING FUEL QUALITY VARIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins, Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | [2021/21] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Cummins, Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURLAPATI, Agneya 915 Gardengate Place, Apt. D Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | 02 /
BREMMER, Robin, J. 6067 Chinkapin Drive Columbus, IN 47201 / US | 03 /
SAAD, Philipe, F. 4422 Mallard Point Columbus, IN 47201 / US | [2019/02] |
Former [2018/50] | 01 /
TURLAPATI, Agneya 896 Blake Street, Apt. D Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | ||
02 /
BREMMER, Robin, J. 6067 Chinkapin Drive Columbus, IN 47201 / US | |||
03 /
SAAD, Philipe, F. 4422 Mallard Point Columbus, IN 47201 / US | Representative(s) | CSY Herts Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [2021/21] |
Former [2018/50] | Ridderbusch, Oliver Prisma IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Landshuter Allee 10 80637 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16889605.8 | 04.02.2016 | [2018/50] | WO2016US16600 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017135957 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3411574 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3411574 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02D19/10, F02D19/06, F02D35/02, F02D41/14, F02M21/02 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
F02D41/1452 (EP,US);
F02D19/029 (EP);
F02D19/0636 (EP,US);
F02D35/023 (EP,US);
F02D35/027 (EP,US);
F02D35/028 (EP,US);
F02D41/0027 (EP,US);
F02D41/144 (EP);
F02M21/0209 (EP);
F02M21/0215 (EP);
F01N11/002 (US);
F01N2900/1406 (US);
F02D19/0642 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0611 (US);
F02D2200/0612 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/50] | F02D19/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR SELBSTEINSTELLENDE MOTORLEISTUNGSPARAMETER BEI VARIIERENDER BRENNSTOFFQUALITÄT | [2018/50] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SELF-ADJUSTING ENGINE PERFORMANCE PARAMETERS DURING FUEL QUALITY VARIATION | [2018/50] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE RÉGLAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE PARAMÈTRES DE PERFORMANCE DE MOTEUR PENDANT UNE VARIATION DE QUALITÉ DE CARBURANT | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 31.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21164962.9 / EP3859137 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2016 | AL | 26.05.2021 | CY | 26.05.2021 | CZ | 26.05.2021 | DK | 26.05.2021 | EE | 26.05.2021 | ES | 26.05.2021 | FI | 26.05.2021 | HR | 26.05.2021 | IT | 26.05.2021 | LT | 26.05.2021 | LV | 26.05.2021 | MC | 26.05.2021 | MK | 26.05.2021 | NL | 26.05.2021 | PL | 26.05.2021 | RO | 26.05.2021 | RS | 26.05.2021 | SE | 26.05.2021 | SI | 26.05.2021 | SK | 26.05.2021 | SM | 26.05.2021 | BG | 26.08.2021 | NO | 26.08.2021 | GR | 27.08.2021 | IS | 26.09.2021 | PT | 27.09.2021 | GB | 04.02.2022 | IE | 04.02.2022 | LU | 04.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | FR | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 04.02.2016 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 04.02.2022 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.02.2016 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 04.02.2022 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 04.02.2022 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 04.02.2022 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 04.02.2022 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 26.05.2021 | |
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | FI | 26.05.2021 | |
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 26.05.2021 | |
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 26.05.2021 | |
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 26.05.2021 | |
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 26.05.2021 | |
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 26.05.2021 | |
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 26.05.2021 | |
LT | 26.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19808829 (MAN B & W DIESEL AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] ** paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] *; | [Y]DE102011110669 (TESTO AG [DE]) [Y] 1,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0035] *; | [Y]EP2843220 (ETH ZUERICH [CH]) [Y] 1-9,12-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] *; | [Y]DE102014207748 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-9,12-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] *; | [I]WO2015172873 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-5,12-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 7 * * page 5, line 19 - page 5, line 34 * | International search | [XY]US5666923 (COLLIER JR ROBERT KIRK [US], et al) [X] 17, 18 * entire document * [Y] 12-16, 19, 20; | [A]US2002000100 (BURG DANIEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2009287391 (DUINEVELD JOHN [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US7769526 (CHEN QIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US8249795 (SURNILLA GOPICHANDRA [US], et al) [Y] 16, 20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012210988 (WILLI MARTIN [US]) [Y] 12-16, 19 * entire document * |