EP3343514 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DIFFERENTIATING OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Jinyuan c/o Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-Tech Park, Nanshan District / Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Li c/o Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-Tech Park, Nanshan District / Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Penza, Giancarlo Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 16891260.8 | 24.11.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016CN107119 | Priority number, date | CN201610109796 | 26.02.2016 Original published format: CN201610109796 | [2018/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017143812 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343514 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/52, G06T15/00, G06T11/00, G06T15/50 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
A63F13/52 (EP,US);
G06T15/04 (KR);
G06T15/00 (CN,US);
G06T11/001 (EP,US);
G06T11/40 (KR);
G06T15/205 (CN);
G06T15/50 (CN,US);
G06T5/00 (KR);
G06T7/73 (US);
G06T7/90 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/27] | G06T15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSCHEIDUNG VON OBJEKTEN | [2018/27] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DIFFERENTIATING OBJECTS | [2018/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DIFFÉRENCIER DES OBJETS | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2018 | Translation filed | 28.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 28.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.03.2021 | 10.03.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.03.2021 | 10.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/32] | 05.04.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1391847 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0081] *; | [Y] - Gilberto Rosado, "Chapter 27. Motion Blur as a Post-Processing Effect", Gpu Gems 3, US, Addison-Wesley, (20070803), ISBN 978-0-321-51526-1, XP055508391 [Y] 1-15 * Sec. 27.1, 27.5 * | [Y] - MATTHIAS HARINGER ET AL, "Effect based scene manipulation for multimodal VR systems", VIRTUAL REALITY CONFERENCE (VR), 2010 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100320), ISBN 978-1-4244-6237-7, pages 43 - 46, XP031656126 [Y] 1-15 * figure 2 * * Sec. 1, Sec. 5.1 * | [Y] - Unity Technologies, "Unity - Manual: Draw Call Batching", (20150101), URL: https://docs.unity3d.com/510/Documentation/Manual/DrawCallBatching.html, (20180920), XP055508562 [Y] 1-15 * page 1 * | [Y] - Dirk Reiners, "Scene Graph Rendering", (20020305), URL: https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/8b1c/c770bbe6abfb0534b368caad589bdb94b102.pdf, (20180920), XP055508566 [Y] 1-15 * Sec. 11 * | [A] - MILÁN MAGDICS ET AL, "Post-processing NPR effects for video games", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 12TH ACM SIGGRAPH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON VIRTUAL-REALITY CONTINUUM AND ITS APPLICATIONS IN INDUSTRY, VRCAI '13, New York, New York, USA, (20130101), doi:10.1145/2534329.2534348, ISBN 978-1-4503-2590-5, pages 147 - 156, XP055508371 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Sec. 5.4.3-5.5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2534329.2534348 |