EP3379038 - STEAM TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Compressor Corporation 34-6, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERADA, Katsumi c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES COMPRESSOR CORPORATION 6-22 Kan-on-Shin-machi 4-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 733-8553 / JP | 02 /
IRIKAWA, Hiroaki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES COMPRESSOR CORPORATION 6-22 Kan-on-Shin-machi 4-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 733-8553 / JP | 03 /
SASAKI, Yuichi c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES COMPRESSOR CORPORATION 6-22 Kan-on-Shin-machi 4-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 733-8553 / JP | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 16891353.1 | 23.02.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016JP00945 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017145190 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3379038 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3379038 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/24, F01D9/02, F01D9/04, F01D25/00, F01D25/28 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F01D9/042 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (EP,US);
F05D2220/31 (EP,US);
F05D2230/80 (EP,US);
F05D2260/30 (EP,US);
F05D2260/31 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DAMPFTURBINE | [2018/39] | English: | STEAM TURBINE | [2018/39] | French: | TURBINE À VAPEUR | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2018 | Translation filed | 20.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 20.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2016 | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | ES | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | NL | 15.01.2020 | PL | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | IE | 23.02.2020 | LU | 23.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | FR | 15.03.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | GB | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 23.02.2016 | |
AL | 15.01.2020 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 23.02.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 15.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
GB | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.02.2016 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 23.02.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 15.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
GB | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 23.02.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 15.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
GB | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 23.02.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 15.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 23.02.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 15.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 15.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2012219412 (NAKAYAMA TAKEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0083] - [0106] * * figure 6 * [A] 7-10 [I] 2; | [XI]JP2014047668 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,3-10 * the whole document *[I] 2 | International search | [A]US2006153683 (DUBE DAVID P [US], et al) [A] 1-10* , paragraphs [0025] to [0031]; fig. 2 to 4 & EP 1589194 A2 & CA 2501525 A1 *; | [A]FR2929983 (SNECMA SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * , page 4, line 14 to page 5, line 16; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]EP2206885 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0031]; fig. 2 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012097601 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0029] to [0031]; fig. 3 & US 2013/0149125 A1 paragraphs [0066] to [0069]; fig. 3 & WO 2012/057309 A1 & EP 2634374 A1 & KR 10-2013-0036346 A & CN 105386798 A *; | [XA]JP2012180748 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1, 3-4 * , paragraphs [0036] to [0040], [0066]; fig. 6 & US 2012/0219412 A1 paragraphs [0090] to [0098], [0158]; fig. 6 & WO 2012/117612 A & EP 2682566 A1 & KR 10-1316295 A & CN 103201460 A * [A] 2, 5-10; | [XA]JP2014047668 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1, 5-6 * , paragraphs [0008] to [0009], [0024], [0034] to [0041]; fig. 3 to 4 (Family: none) * [A] 2-4, 7-10 |