EP3323966 - DOOR LATCH DEVICE WITH CHILD LOCK MECHANISM, AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING CHILD LOCK MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Kinzoku ACT Corporation 1-1-2 Takashima Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-0011 / JP | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAOKA Tomoharu c/o MITSUI KINZOKU ACT CORPORATION 48 Kamome-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0813 / JP | 02 /
NOZAWA Hideaki c/o MITSUI KINZOKU ACT CORPORATION 48 Kamome-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0813 / JP | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2018/21] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16891562.7 | 03.08.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016JP72829 | Priority number, date | JP20160031654 | 23.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016031654 | [2018/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017145405 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3323966 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3323966 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E05B77/26, E05B79/08 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
E05B79/08 (EP,US);
E05B77/26 (US);
E05B77/265 (EP,US);
E05B83/36 (US);
Y10S292/61 (US);
Y10T292/1047 (US);
Y10T292/1082 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | E05B77/26, E05B79/08, E05B83/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TÜRVERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT KINDERSICHERUNGSMECHANISMUS UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES KINDERSICHERUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2018/21] | English: | DOOR LATCH DEVICE WITH CHILD LOCK MECHANISM, AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING CHILD LOCK MECHANISM | [2018/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROU DE PORTE AVEC MÉCANISME DE VERROU POUR ENFANT, ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DE MÉCANISME DE VERROU POUR ENFANT | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2018 | Translation filed | 15.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 15.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2016 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | DK | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | ES | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | IT | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | NL | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SE | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | TR | 15.07.2020 | IE | 03.08.2020 | LU | 03.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | GB | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 03.08.2016 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
TR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 03.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GB | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.08.2016 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
TR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 03.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GB | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 03.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GB | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 03.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5000495 (WOLFGANG THAU [CA], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [A]US6406073 (WATANABE HIROFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-4* figure 7 *; | [I]JP2006037497 (OHI SEISAKUSHO CO LTD) [I] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2008203737 (TOMASZEWSKI KRIS [CA], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0066]; figures 19A-19D * [I] 2; | [X]JP2009030308 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2015182008 (MITSUI KINZOKU ACT CORP [JP]) [I] 1,3 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH0247368U (Daihatsu Motor Co., Ltd.) [Y] 1-4 * , specification, page 5, line 20 to page 15, line 5; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH10121811 (KIEKERT GMBH CO KG) [Y] 2-4 * , fig. 1 & US 5921594 A fig. 1 & DE 19638700 A1 & FR 2753741 A1 *; | [Y]JP2000303732 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) [Y] 2-4 * , fig. 7 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2006037497 (OHI SEISAKUSHO CO LTD) [Y] 4* , paragraphs [0059] to [0060]; fig. 25 & US 2006/0087129 A1 paragraphs [0099] to [0101]; fig. 25 & EP 1621705 A2 & DE 602005005570 T2 & CN 1727623 A *; | [XY]JP2009030308 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0026] to [0046]; fig. 1 to 2, 9 to 11, 17 to 18 (Family: none) * [Y] 1-4 |