EP3425614 - DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGANUMA, Ken c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Hisayoshi c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
YOSHINO, Masayuki c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 16892440.5 | 29.02.2016 | [2019/02] | WO2016JP56041 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017149595 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3425614 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G09C1/00, G06F21/60, H04L9/14, H04L29/06, H04L9/00, H04L9/08 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
G06F21/602 (US);
G06F21/60 (EP,US);
G06F21/6227 (US);
G09C1/00 (EP,US);
H04L63/0478 (EP,US);
H04L9/008 (EP,US);
H04L9/0819 (US);
H04L9/0891 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | G09C1/00, G06F21/60, H04L9/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/02] | English: | DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2019/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2018 | Translation filed | 20.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013275752 (ZHANG XINWEN [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0024] *; | [X]EP2704354 (TOSHIBA INC KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0013]; figure 8 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] ** paragraph [0033] *; | [X]US2015270964 (YASUDA MASAYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0084] * | International search | [XY]JP2012195733 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1, 2, 4-6, 8 * , paragraphs [0011] to [0068]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [Y] 3, 7; | [Y]WO2013072947 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 3, 7* , paragraphs [0032] to [0045]; fig. 6, 8 (Family: none) * |