EP3425198 - WIND TURBINE START ASSIST DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDO, Toshiyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
HARAGUCHI, Eisuke c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Jiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
ONO, Hitomi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 16892502.2 | 01.03.2016 | [2019/02] | WO2016JP56258 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017149657 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3425198 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/04, F03D7/02 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
F03D7/026 (EP,US);
F03D7/047 (US);
F05B2260/85 (EP,US);
F05B2270/20 (EP,US);
F05B2270/32 (EP,US);
F05B2270/327 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | F03D7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Title | German: | HILFSVORRICHTUNG FÜR WINDTURBINENANLAUF | [2019/02] | English: | WIND TURBINE START ASSIST DEVICE | [2019/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AIDE AU DÉMARRAGE D'ÉOLIENNE | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2018 | Translation filed | 24.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 09.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012187684 (KAWAS PERCY [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0010] - [0032] - [0 40] - [0042] - [0 65] - [0071]; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP2757253 (ALSTOM WIND SLU [ES]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [E]EP3413087 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] - [0 33] - [0036] - [ 120] - [0132]; figures 1,2,15,16 *; | [A]EP2327876 (LM GLASFIBER AS [DK]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [YA]JP2012021412 (KYOSAN ELECTRIC MFG) [Y] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0034] to [0038]; fig. 1, 7 (Family: none) * [A] 3; | [YA]US2014271181 (PERLEY THOMAS FRANKLIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0027], [0029]; fig. 1 to 3 & EP 2778395 A2 * [A] 3 |