EP3430714 - BIDIRECTIONAL DC-DC CONVERTER AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2021/07] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xiaobo Universal Plaza 10 Jiuxianqiao Lu Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | 02 /
YUEN, Kuenfaat Room 1501 Tin Mei House Tin Ping Estate SheungShui, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | 03 /
FAN, Guoxing Universal Plaza 10 Jiuxianqiao Lu Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | 04 /
YAO, Dawei Room 8-2-702 No. 3 Qingnianluxili Qingnian North Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100123 / CN | 05 /
CANALES, Francisco Segelhalde 38 CH-5405 Baden-Dattwil / CH | [2019/08] |
Former [2019/04] | 01 /
YANG, Xiaobo Universal Plaza 10 Jiuxianqiao Lu Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | ||
02 /
YUEN, Kuenfaat Room 1501 Tin Mei House Tin Ping Estate SheungShui, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | |||
03 /
FAN, Guoxing Universal Plaza 10 Jiuxianqiao Lu Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | |||
04 /
YAO, Dawei Room 8-2-702 No. 3 Qingnianluxili Qingnian North Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100123 / CN | |||
05 /
CANALES, Francisco Husmatt 2 CH-5405 Baden-Dattwil / CH | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 16893857.9 | 15.03.2016 | [2019/04] | WO2016CN76331 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017156692 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3430714 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3430714 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02M3/337, H02M7/483, H02M7/5387 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
H02M3/33584 (EP,US);
H02M3/33573 (EP,US);
H02M3/3376 (US);
H02M7/483 (EP,US);
H02M7/5387 (EP,US);
H02M1/0058 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | H02M3/335 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIDIREKTIONALER GLEICHSPANNUNGSWANDLER UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/04] | English: | BIDIRECTIONAL DC-DC CONVERTER AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/04] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR CONTINU-CONTINU BIDIRECTIONNEL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 20.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2016 | AL | 23.06.2021 | AT | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | DK | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | ES | 23.06.2021 | FI | 23.06.2021 | HR | 23.06.2021 | IT | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MK | 23.06.2021 | MT | 23.06.2021 | NL | 23.06.2021 | PL | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | RS | 23.06.2021 | SE | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | SM | 23.06.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | NO | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | PT | 25.10.2021 | IE | 15.03.2022 | LU | 15.03.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 15.03.2016 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 15.03.2016 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.03.2016 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011031930 (KAJOUKE LATEEF A [US]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0039]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP2448102 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0040] , [0042]; figure 1 *; | [Y]CN202424533U (SHENZHEN MEGMEET ELECTRICAL CO) [Y] 1-14* abstract *; | [Y]CN103023366 (UNIV NANJING SCIENCE & TECH) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [X]CN102064702 (CHUANG LIU) [X] 1, 3-13 * description, paragraphs [0023], [0027]-[0028] and figures 1, 3, 4 *; | [A]US2011149609 (MOUSSAOUI ZAKI [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]CN103731036 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1, 3-13 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2014369076 (CHO YOUNG JIN [KR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]CN104506039 (SHIJIAZHUANG TONGHE ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1, 3-13 * figures 3-5 *; | [A]CN104734312 (LSIS CO LTD) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]CN204465346U (NEOVOLTAIC ENERGY NANTONG CO LTD) [X] 1, 3-13 * description, paragraphs [0012]-[0013] and figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP5838859B (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | CN103023366 | - FRANCISCO CANALES et al., "Novel Modulation Method of a Three-Level Isolated Full-Bridge LLC Resonant DC-DC Converter for Wide-output Voltage Application", 15th International Power Electronics and Motion Control Conference, EPE-PEMC 2012 ECC Europe, Novi Sad, Serbia |